Precision Machine and Design Company, LLC v. Park-Ohio Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Precision Machine and Design Company, LLC
Defendant: Park-Ohio Industries, Inc. doing business as Bates Rubber, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Mary G. Burns
Counter Claimant: Park-Ohio Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01039
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 5/7/2021. (mbm)
May 6, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Precision Machine and Design Company, LLC Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Leonard, Terry)
May 4, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw proposed order submitted by Precision Machine and Design Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Motion)(Leonard, Terry)
April 7, 2021 Filing 13 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Precision Machine and Design Company, LLC by Park-Ohio Industries, Inc..(Holder, Michael)
April 6, 2021 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Non-Jury Trial set for 5/9/2022 at 9:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2022 at 9:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, and Legal Memoranda, if any, due by 4/28/2022. (ejc)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR deadline is 6/29/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 6/8/2021. Discovery due by 12/7/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 6/8/2021. Motions due by 1/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 4/6/2021. (ars)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/6/2021. Present were attys Leonard and Holder. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter AT&T.) (ars)
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Park-Ohio Industries, Inc.. (Holder, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Park-Ohio Industries, Inc.. (Holder, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Park-Ohio Industries, Inc..(Holder, Michael)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER:TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, April 6, 2021, 9:45 AM CT before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. Parties shall dial into our telephonic conference service at: (877) 411-9748. The Access Code is 828 9188. If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at # http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.docCounsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bates Rubber, Inc., Park-Ohio Industries, Inc. from Henry County Chancery Court, case number 24851 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3563002), filed by Bates Rubber, Inc., Park-Ohio Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Linda Kold, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notices to State Court and Pltf's Atty)(Holder, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision Machine and Design Company, LLC v. Park-Ohio Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Machine and Design Company, LLC
Represented By: Terry J. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park-Ohio Industries, Inc. doing business as Bates Rubber, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Stewart Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mary G. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Park-Ohio Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Stewart Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?