Johnson v. Volunteer Home Care, Inc.
Plaintiff: Venither Johnson
Defendant: Volunteer Home Care, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01118
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Venither Johnson of Filing Consent Form (Brady, Scott)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/8/2021. (mbm)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed - Proposed Order Submitted by Volunteer Home Care, Inc.. (Stamelos, Mark)
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E. Brady on behalf of Venither Johnson (Brady, Scott)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Bohrer on behalf of Venither Johnson (Bohrer, Philip)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Venither Johnson as to Volunteer Home Care, Inc.. (Foster, Mark)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Volunteer Home Care, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (skc)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Volunteer Home Care, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3679756), filed by Venither Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Plaintiff's Consent Form, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B -- Defendant's Paystub to Plaintiff for 7-15-21 to 7-31-21 Pay Period, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Proposed Summons; Plaintiff Requests Clerk Please Issue)(Foster, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Volunteer Home Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venither Johnson
Represented By: Mark Nathan Foster
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volunteer Home Care, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Stamelos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?