Beasley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: James Brent Beasley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv01142
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Annie T Christoff
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #7 . Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 10/25/21. (skc)
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Brent Beasley. (mbm)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #2 . Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 10/4/21. (skc)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 PLEASE DISREGARD 72.1 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT WAS RE-ENTERED IN ERROR. Modified on 10/4/2021 (skc).
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Brent Beasley. (mbm)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by James Brent Beasley. (Attachments: #1 Exs. 1-20, #2 Presider card)(mbm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2021: #3 Judicial assignment card) (jae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brent Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?