Johnson v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robbie Johnson
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc. and Ronda Gooch
Case Number: 1:2021cv01161
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #25 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/16/2021. (mbm)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Verified Complaint (proposed order submitted) by Robbie Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barnes, Robert)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Verified Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Verified Complaint)(Grisham, J.)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #21 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF PAGE LIMIT FOR MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/24/21. (cdi)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #20 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT. Responses due by 12/9/2021. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/24/21. (cdi)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages proposed order submitted by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Grisham, J.)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Grisham, J.)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT #14 . Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/22/21. (skc)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Affidavit Verification Johnson) (Barnes, Robert)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S #6 MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/3/2021. (mbm)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson: IN PERSON Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2021 re #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand. Opening statements. Arguments by Parties. Responses by Parties. Closing statements. Court to issue Order. PRESENT: Robert Barnes, Brennan Brooks (via phone) for Plaintiffs. Gregory Grisham for Defendant. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (mbb)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #11 MOTION TO PROCEED PRO HAC VICE as to Robert E. Barnes. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/29/21. (cdi)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Ronda Gooch, Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Grisham, J.)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand , proposed order submitted, filed by All Defendants. (Grisham, J.)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand , proposed order submitted, filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ronda Gooch Signed Declaration, #2 Exhibit Tyson Barbara Masters Declaration Opposition to Motion to Remand)(Grisham, J.)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 proposed order, #2 cert of good standing, #3 cert of good standing, #4 cert of good standing, #5 cert of good standing)(Barnes, Robert)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO PROCEED PRO HAC VICE WITHOUT PREJUDICE #9 . Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/28/21. (skc)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3736614) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Poposed Order)(Barnes, Robert)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/25/2021. (mbm)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Re: #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand. IN PERSON Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2021 02:00 PM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Emergency MOTION to Remand , proposed order submitted, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Supplement - Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For This Court To Hear And Rule On Plaintiffs Motion To Remand Action To State Court, #3 Affidavit - Declaration of Robert E. Barnes, Esq.)(Brooks, Brennan)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brennan Tyler Brooks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brooks, Brennan)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Chancery Court for Dyer County, Tennessee, case number 21-cv-548 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3730204), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Elizabeth Chappelear, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Carl Imhof, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Ronda Gooch, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Grisham, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Johnson
Represented By: Robert E. Barnes
Represented By: Brennan Tyler Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: J. Gregory Grisham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronda Gooch
Represented By: J. Gregory Grisham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?