Baggett v. Mehr et al
Plaintiff: Keith Baggett
Defendant: John Mehr and Scott Conger
Case Number: 1:2021cv01175
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Keith Baggett. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 Mail (DE#4 ) Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Keith Baggett. (cdi)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to comply with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2) or pay the $402 civil filing fee, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 11/03/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Keith Baggett. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Keith Baggett. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 envelope)(mbm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2021: #3 Judicial assignment cards) (jae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baggett v. Mehr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Conger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?