Transou v. Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC
Plaintiff: Valerie D. Transou
Defendant: Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01062
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT' UNOPPOSED #16 MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/8/22. (mbm)
June 8, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC. (Leyes, Courtney)
May 23, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Valerie D. Transou of Consent to Join of Edith Thomas (Turner, Robert)
May 12, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE by Valerie D. Transou of Consent to Join of Garrick Reed (Turner, Robert)
April 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by George D Adams on behalf of Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC (Adams, George)
April 19, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Boshoku America, Inc. for Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC.. (Leyes, Courtney)
April 19, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Leyes on behalf of Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC (Leyes, Courtney)
April 13, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Valerie D. Transou. Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC waiver sent on 4/13/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Turner, Robert)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russ Bryant on behalf of Valerie D. Transou (Bryant, Joseph)
April 11, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Valerie D. Transou (Morelli, Robert)
April 11, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (skc)
April 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of Valerie D. Transou (Turner, Robert)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3851155), filed by Valerie D. Transou. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be Issued, #3 Exhibit A- Valerie Transou Consent to Join)(Jackson, Gordon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transou v. Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie D. Transou
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Boshoku Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Leyes
Represented By: George D Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?