Jackson v. Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness et al
Plaintiff: Nicol Jackson
Defendant: Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania, Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee and Watchtower Bible Tract Society Of New York Inc. NY
Case Number: 1:2022cv01133
Filed: June 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower Bible Tract Society Of New York Inc. NY, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Harvey, Robb)
July 18, 2022 Filing 60 RESPONSE to Motion re #56 MOTION, #55 MOTION, #57 MOTION Consolidated Response filed by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower Bible Tract Society Of New York Inc. NY, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order (being submitted in Word))(Harvey, Robb)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING #54 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SET DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 7/6/2022. (ars)
July 5, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by Nicol Jackson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
July 5, 2022 Filing 57 MOTION to have interrogatories answered by Nicol Jackson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
July 5, 2022 Filing 56 MOTION to Jury Trial in Western Tennessee by Nicol Jackson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
July 5, 2022 Filing 55 MOTION to be heard on request to utilize Court appointed pro se counsel, Court Electronic Filing System, and Amended Jury by demand submitted through Western TN Civil Court by Nicol Jackson. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
June 23, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION Set Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support re #40 Amended Complaint, #39 Amended Complaint UNOPPOSED by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower Bible Tract Society Of New York Inc. NY, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania. (Harvey, Robb)
June 17, 2022 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters, including screening of the complaint to determine whether or not summons shall be issued by the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and Local Rule 4.1(b)(2) (csf)
June 16, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
June 16, 2022 Filing 52 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:21-cv-00720. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2022: #2 Judge Card) (skc).
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/16/2022. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
June 16, 2022 Case transferred to the Western District of Tennessee. (vh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
June 8, 2022 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Support re #41 Amended MOTION to Transfer Venue to Western District of Tennessee Unopposed/in agreement filed by Nicol Jackson. (Jackson, Nicol) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Jackson is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by June 14, 2022, why the defendants' amended motion to transfer venue should not be granted as unopposed or for the reasons stated in the motion #41 and supporting memorandum of law #42 . Jackson is warned that failure to comply with this Order to Show Cause may result in a recommendation that the transfer motion be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/24/2022. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 5/25/2022 (kc). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE the defendants' original motion to transfer venue (Doc. No. #19 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/29/2022. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
April 26, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION for Jury Trial filed by Nicol Jackson.(Jackson, Nicol) Modified on 4/28/2022 (kc). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Robert Ciranko filed by Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania re: #41 Amended MOTION to Transfer Venue to Western District of Tennessee . (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 45 DECLARATION of William Gross filed by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee re: #41 Amended MOTION to Transfer Venue to Western District of Tennessee . (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Robert Ciranko filed by Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania re: #41 Amended MOTION to Transfer Venue to Western District of Tennessee . (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Hernan Steele filed by Watchtower Bible Tract Society Of New York Inc. NY re: #41 Amended MOTION to Transfer Venue to Western District of Tennessee . (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support of #41 Amended MOTION to Transfer Venue to Western District of Tennessee filed by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower Bible Tract Society Of New York Inc. NY, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania . (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Filing 41 Amended MOTION to Transfer Venue to Western District of Tennessee by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower Bible Tract Society Of New York Inc. NY, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania. (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT Nicol Jackson against All Defendants, filed by Nicol Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment amended demand, #2 Attachment amended cover, #3 Attachment amended neglect)(Jackson, Nicol) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nicol Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment amended cover sheet, #2 Attachment amended complaint for neglect)(Jackson, Nicol) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Jackson is ORDERED to file an amended complaint by April 11, 2022. The Court will reserve ruling on the defendants' motion to transfer #19 until after Jackson has an opportunity to file an amended complaint. Jackson's motions to appoint counsel #16 , #17 are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling after the Court resolves the defendants' motion to transfer. Jackson's motion to stay ruling on the defendants' motion to transfer until after the Court rules on her motions to appoint counsel #22 is FOUND MOOT. Jackson's motion for a subpoena #31 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The defendants' motion to stay discovery or for an extension of time to respond to Jackson's interrogatories #32 and for leave to file a reply in support of that motion #37 are FOUND MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/22/2022. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
March 21, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Leave to File Reply or, in the Alternative, for Additional Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests re #32 MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests) by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Reply)(Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
March 14, 2022 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests) filed by Nicol Jackson. (Jackson, Nicol) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
March 14, 2022 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to re #31 First MOTION motion to subpoena via Court Process and Service filed by Nicol Jackson. (Jackson, Nicol) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 First MOTION motion to subpoena via Court Process and Service (and Request to Stay Discovery) filed by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania. (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support of #32 MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests) filed by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 2: Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories)(Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative,, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests) by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania. (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Filing 31 First MOTION motion to subpoena via Court Process and Service by Nicol Jackson. (Jackson, Nicol) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
February 9, 2022 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to re #22 MOTION, #26 MOTION to Add Defendant re #1 Complaint, filed by Nicol Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Amended Complaint)(kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Plaintiff Nicol Jackson has filed two motions to add defendants as parties to this action (Doc. Nos. #26 , #27 ). Because Jackson has not met the procedural requirements of those rules, including by filing a proposed amended complaint naming the new parties with her motion, the motions seeking to joint parties (Doc. Nos. #26 , #27 ) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling as a motion to amend the complaint with an accompanying proposed amended pleading. Jackson also asks the Court for permission to use the Court's CM/ECF filing system. That motion is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/3/2022. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
January 20, 2022 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #22 MOTION, #26 MOTION to Add Defendant re #1 Complaint, and to Docket Entry 23 filed by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania. (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Filing 27 Motion to add entity and APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nicol Jackson. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Add Defendant re #1 Complaint, by Nicol Jackson. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to re #17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and #16 MOTION to Not Change Venue and Appoint Counsel filed by Nicol Jackson. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
January 18, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to re #19 MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Tennessee filed by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania. (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Tennessee filed by Nicol Jackson. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to not rule on defense motion #19 until ruling on motion to appoint counsel #17 and to be granted access to ECF system by Nicol Jackson. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
January 3, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #16 MOTION to Not Change Venue and Appoint Counsel filed by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania. (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
December 29, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of #19 MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Tennessee filed by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness(Headquarters on King Drive, New York, NY) . (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
December 29, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Tennessee by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness(Headquarters on King Drive, New York, NY). (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
December 28, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Telephone Number by Nicol Jackson. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
December 28, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Nicol Jackson. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
December 28, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Not Change Venue and Appoint Counsel by Nicol Jackson. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
December 15, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania served on 11/5/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
December 15, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee answer due 12/29/2021; Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania answer due 12/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/14/2021. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
November 30, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robb S. Harvey and Michael A. Cottone admitted to this court. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee served on 11/8/2021. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania. (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robb S. Harvey on behalf of Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania (Harvey, Robb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing date correction by Nicol Jackson re #1 Complaint. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 Summons issued as to Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness (Headquarters on Red Mill Road in New York, NY), Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, and Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania. (Service packet forwarded to USM.) (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE: Because the plaintiff's IFP application #2 reflects that she lacks sufficient financial resources to pay the full filing fee in advance without undue hardship, it is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send the plaintiff four service packets. The plaintiff MUST complete one service packet for each defendant, and return the four completed service packets to the Clerk's Office within 21 DAYS of the date this order is entered on the docket. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to oversee service of process, enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, regarding required initial discovery disclosures, shall not apply. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/6/2021. (xc: 4 service packets and Order forwarded to Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 10/7/2021 (kc). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/6/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
September 17, 2021 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nicol Jackson. (kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness (Headquarters on King Drive, New York, NY), Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness (Headquarters on Red Mill Road in New York, NY), Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee, and Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania, filed by Nicol Jackson.(kc) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 6/17/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicol Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witness
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watchtower and Tract Society of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Michael Anthony Cottone
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Hall of Jehovah Witnesses Paris, Tennessee
Represented By: Michael Anthony Cottone
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watchtower Bible Tract Society Of New York Inc. NY
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?