Puckett,et al v. Jabbar, et al
Plaintiff: Carl Puckett and Marcella Puckett
Defendant: National Basketball Association, Ain Jeem, Inc., Chris Stavro, Deborah Morales, Iconony, Axenics, Inc., Virginia Hernandez Covington, Anthony E. Porcelli, Richard Guerra, Rafael Perez-Pineiro, Alejandro Fernandez, Nicole Fondura, Kareem Abdul Jabbar, NBA, Geoffrey Lottenberg, Joycelyn Brown, Jessica Sarah Kramer, Stephen D. Milbrath, Andrew David Lockton, Etsy, Inc. and Arthur Robert Weaver
Case Number: 1:2023cv01143
Filed: July 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcella Puckett, Carl Puckett as to Richard Guerra. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 envelope)(gkp)
September 15, 2023 Filing 16 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Richard Guerra. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Guerra In Support of His Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(gkp)
September 8, 2023 Filing 15 Opposition and Memorandum to Defendant Stephen Milbrath's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint re #10 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibits D, #2 Exhibit 1, Identity of Cookies, #3 Exhibit 2, Lack of Jurisdiction, #4 Exhibit 3, Middle District Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4, Initial Contact, #6 Exhibit 5, Email offer of Representation, #7 Exhibit 6, Intent to recover damages, #8 Exhibit 7, Email baseless suit, #9 Exhibit 8, Email discovering fraud, #10 Exhibit 9, Email reply, #11 Exhibit 10, Notice Sent to Defendants, #12 Exhibit 11, Etsy partial list, #13 Exhibit 12, Etsy digital cookie, #14 Exhibit 13, NBA online commerce, #15 Exhibit 14, NBA assertion of standing, #16 Exhibit 15, Rico Deft filing, #17 Exhibit 16, Rico Deft filing, #18 Exhibit 17, Rico Deft digital footprint, #19 Exhibit 18, Rico Deft advertising, #20 Exhibit 19, Brickell digital footprint, #21 envelope)(gkp)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 8/30/2023. (ars)
August 30, 2023 Filing 13 Emergency Ex Parte Motion to File Under Seal and Motion for Leave for Expedited Jurisdictional Discovery and to Amend the Plaintiff's Complaint and for Joinder Under FRCP 19 and 20 and Appendix C of Exhibits in Support Thereof. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1,URL ownership, #3 Exhibit 2,CISA Report, #4 Exhibit 3,WHOIS report, #5 Exhibit 4,Licensing Bureau, #6 Exhibit 5,Notice of Appeal, #7 Exhibit 6,RICO Deft Motion, #8 Exhibit 7,Attachment to RICO Deft Motion, #9 Exhibit 8,Acknowledgement of Axencis, #10 Exhibit 9,Email to Plaintiff, #11 Exhibit 10,RICO Deft Motion, #12 Exhibit 11,Proof of Purchase, #13 Exhibit 12,Sworn Testimony, #14 Exhibit 13,Address Listed in Purchase, #15 Exhibit 14, Trademark Info from Linked In Profile, #16 Exhibit 15,NBA's Claim, #17 Exhibit 16,Fraudulent Advertising, #18 Exhibit Filing to Unknown Address)(gkp)
August 30, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Oppose Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Local Rules of Court 12.01 to Extend the Length of Response in Opposition to 30 Pages Excluding the Appendix of Exhibits by Carl Puckett, Marcella Puckett. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(gkp)
August 23, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcella Puckett, Carl Puckett as to Stephen D. Milbrath. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 envelope)(gkp)
August 17, 2023 Filing 10 Pro Se Verified Motion and Memorandum to Dismiss Complaint Against Stephen Milbrath filed by Stephen D. Milbrath. (mlk)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 8/17/2023. (ars)
July 24, 2023 CLERK'S REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Clerk's review of preliminary matters completed. (csf)
July 24, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Carl Puckett and Marcella Puckett. (skc)
July 21, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Issued summons handed to Plaintiffs at the counter in order to effect service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons -Brown, #2 Summons -Etsy, #3 Summons -Fernandez, #4 Summons -Fondura, #5 Summons Guerra, #6 Summons -Hernandez-Covington, #7 Summons -Iconomy, #8 Summons -Jabbar, #9 Summons -Jeem, #10 Summons -Kramer, #11 Summons -Lockton, #12 Summons -Lottenberg, #13 Summons -Milbrath, #14 Summons -Morales, #15 Summons -NBA, #16 Summons -Paniero, #17 Summons -Porcelli, #18 Summons -Stavro, #19 Summons -Weaver)(cdi)
July 21, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (cdi)
July 21, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (cdi)
July 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi)
July 21, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Agreement to Receive Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by Marcella Puckett. (cdi)
July 21, 2023 Filing 2 Filing fee paid: $ 402, receipt number 100000378. (cdi)
July 21, 2023 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief for Violations of the Federal Racketeer Influenced and Crime Organizations Act against All Defendants, filed by Marcella Puckett and Carl Puckett. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits -A, #2 Appendix of Exhibits -A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Assignment Label)(cdi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puckett,et al v. Jabbar, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Basketball Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ain Jeem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Stavro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iconony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axenics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Hernandez Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony E. Porcelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Perez-Pineiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Fondura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kareem Abdul Jabbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Lottenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joycelyn Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Sarah Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D. Milbrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew David Lockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etsy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Robert Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?