Crite v. Trustgard Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Cinnetha Crite
Defendant: Trustgard Insurance Company and JOHN DOE
Not Classified By Court: Gail Mooney
Case Number: 1:2023cv01237
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE by Cinnetha Crite of Service of Initial Disclosures (Crider, Terri)
December 11, 2023 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 1/27/2025 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2025 10:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2025. A court reporter is required for this proceeding. (ars)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 2/5/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 2/5/2024. ADR deadline is 2/29/2024. Discovery due by 8/1/2024. Motions due by 8/31/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 12/11/2023. (ars)
December 11, 2023 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/11/2023. Present were attys Crider and Reedy. Scheduling and Trial dates discussed. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter Teams.) (ars)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Parties' Mediator Selection by Trustgard Insurance Company. (Reedy, Brandon)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Reedy, Brandon)
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Reassignment label)(mbm)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting 9] MOTION to Continue proposed order submitted filed by Cinnetha Crite. Telephonic Scheduling Conference reset for 12/11/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 12/4/2023. Note: text only, no image associated with document. (ars)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue proposed order submitted by Cinnetha Crite. (Crider, Terri)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Trustgard Insurance Company.(Reedy, Brandon)
November 7, 2023 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 12/07/2023 9:45 AM CT before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. A phone number will be emailed to counsel prior to the hearing date.If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at # https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/sites/tnwd/files/LR162_Standard_0.doc. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
November 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 3 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trustgard Insurance Company. (Reedy, Brandon)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trustgard Insurance Company from Madison County Circuit Court, case number C-23-248 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4274035), filed by Trustgard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reedy, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crite v. Trustgard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Gail Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinnetha Crite
Represented By: Spencer Barnes
Represented By: Terri Smith Crider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustgard Insurance Company
Represented By: Brandon W. Reedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?