Horton v. Centurion of Tennessee, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Horton
Defendant: Centurion of Tennessee, LLC, Tennessee Department of Correction, Northwest Correctional Complex, Richard P Guerrant, III, M.D. and Tommie June Hendrix Labonte, APRN
Case Number: 1:2023cv01239
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Northwest Correctional Complex, Tennessee Department of Correction. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Dolan, Toni-Ann)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION #17 . Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/15/2023. (gkp)
December 15, 2023 Filing 17 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by Northwest Correctional Complex, Tennessee Department of Correction. (Dolan, Toni-Ann)
December 15, 2023 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Northwest Correctional Complex, Tennessee Department of Correction. Amendment to #12 Notice of Appearance . (Dolan, Toni-Ann)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING #13 MOTION FOR EXTENSION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/11/23. (mbm)
December 11, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank LoGrippo on behalf of Northwest Correctional Complex (LoGrippo, Frank)
December 11, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Northwest Correctional Complex. (Dolan, Toni-Ann)
December 11, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Toni-Ann Marie Dolan on behalf of Northwest Correctional Complex (Dolan, Toni-Ann)
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2023 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
November 28, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Centurion of Tennessee, LLC, Richard P Guerrant, III, M.D., Tommie June Hendrix Labonte, APRN.(Floyd, John)
November 13, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Franklin Floyd, Jr on behalf of Centurion of Tennessee, LLC, Tommie June Hendrix Labonte, APRN (Floyd, John)
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Floyd on behalf of Centurion of Tennessee, LLC, Tommie June Hendrix Labonte, APRN (Floyd, John)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO MODIFY DOCKET. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/8/23. (skc)
November 7, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons TDOC, #2 Summons NCC, #3 Summons Guerrant, #4 Summons Labonte)(skc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 2 Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4274428), filed by Joshua Horton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Glanton, Luvell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. Centurion of Tennessee, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Horton
Represented By: Luvell L. Glanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: John F. Floyd
Represented By: John Franklin Floyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Department of Correction
Represented By: Toni-Ann Marie Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Correctional Complex
Represented By: Toni-Ann Marie Dolan
Represented By: Frank LoGrippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard P Guerrant, III, M.D.
Represented By: John Franklin Floyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommie June Hendrix Labonte, APRN
Represented By: John F. Floyd
Represented By: John Franklin Floyd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?