United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority v. A Temporary Right to Enter upon Land in Chester County, Tennessee, and Hunter Faulkner, et ux.
Plaintiff: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority
Defendant: A Temporary Right to Enter upon Land in Chester County, Tennessee, and Hunter Faulkner, et ux.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02130
Filed: March 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1358 Land Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 First MOTION to Vacate Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motions to Vacate filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chase, James)
April 28, 2023 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Hunter Faulkner's Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Chase email to Johnson, #2 Chase email to Johnson)(Chase, James)
April 27, 2023 Filing 23 AMENDED DOCUMENT by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. Amendment to #13 Notice (Other), Amended Notice. (Chase, James)
April 14, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Chase on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Chase, James)
April 13, 2023 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by A Temporary Right to Enter upon Land in Chester County, Tennessee, and Hunter Faulkner, et ux.. (Johnson, Jay)
April 13, 2023 Filing 20 First MOTION to Vacate by A Temporary Right to Enter upon Land in Chester County, Tennessee, and Hunter Faulkner, et ux.. (Johnson, Jay)
April 13, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by A Temporary Right to Enter upon Land in Chester County, Tennessee, and Hunter Faulkner, et ux.. (Johnson, Jay)
April 13, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by A Temporary Right to Enter upon Land in Chester County, Tennessee, and Hunter Faulkner, et ux.. (Johnson, Jay)
April 13, 2023 Filing 17 First MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Johnson, Jay)
April 13, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear by All Defendants. (Johnson, Jay)
April 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority re #4 Notice (Other) of Filing of Corrected Map (Attachments: #1 Corrected Map)(Chase, James)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER OF POSSESSION (ECF NO. 10) AND ORDER OF POSSESSION #10 . Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/5/23. (skc)
March 28, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority of Completion of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service and Affidavit of Service - Hunter Faulkner, #2 Certificate of Service and Affidavit of Service - Rebecca Faulkner)(Sanders, Christopher)
March 20, 2023 Filing 12 Received payment of $10 from US Treasury/TVA, Rcpt #100000203. (pursuant to Order -DE#8 ) (cdi)
March 20, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sanders, Christopher)
March 20, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Submitted)(Sanders, Christopher)
March 20, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority of Tendering Deposit (Sanders, Christopher)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION TO DEPOSIT FUNDS AND DIRECTING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/15/23. (mbm)
March 14, 2023 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sanders, Christopher)
March 14, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Deposit Funds by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Submitted)(Sanders, Christopher)
March 14, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by All Plaintiffs.(Sanders, Christopher)
March 14, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority Declaration of Taking (Attachments: #1 Map)(Sanders, Christopher)
March 14, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE to all parties: This case was incorrectly opened in the Western Division of the Western District. It was transferred to the Jackson office and the case number has been modified. Please take notice of the case number, as the only change in the number will be the divisional code at the beginning of the case number. (Ex: 1:XX-cv-XXXX or 2:XX-cv-XXXX). The old case has been closed and will contain a case flag that it is closed. Particular attention should be used when selecting the case number during CM/ECF filing of future pleading to ensure that you are filing in the correct (open) Case. The new case number is 1:23-cv-2130. Please list the correct case number on all future pleadings. (cdi)
March 14, 2023 Filing 2 Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (cdi)
March 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority v. A Temporary Right to Enter upon Land in Chester County, Tennessee, and Hunter Faulkner, et ux.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: Christopher W. Sanders
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Temporary Right to Enter upon Land in Chester County, Tennessee, and Hunter Faulkner, et ux.
Represented By: Jay L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?