Petroleos Mexicano v. Pemex, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Petroleos Mexicano
Defendant: Pemex, Inc. and Haitham Alyousef
Case Number: 2:2010cv02231
Filed: April 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ATTACHMENT Exh 1 to ORDER #26 granting Motion to Dismiss; granting Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/8/10. (Attachments: #1 Exh 2)(ehg)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JUDGMENT In accordance with the Order Of Dismissal And Permanent Injunction entered on 7/8/2010, this cause is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/8/2010. (Anderson, S.)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Dismiss; granting #25 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/8/10. (Anderson, S.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2010: #1 main document) (ehg).
July 7, 2010 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Permanent Injunction ; Proposed Order Submitted by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of Dismissal and Permanent Injunction, #2 Exhibit 1 to Order of Dismissal - Photos of Authorized PEMEX gas stations, #3 Exhibit 2 to Order of Dismissal - Photos of Unathorized Pemex gas stations)(Golwen, John)
June 9, 2010 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2010. Discovery due by 2/14/2011. Joinder of Parties due by 8/13/2010. Initial Motions to Dismiss due by 9/15/2010. Filing Dispositive Motions 3/14/2010. (ehg)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. Entry of this order CANCELS the scheduling conference set for TUESDAY, 6/15/2010 at 10:30 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 6/9/2010. (Claxton, Charmiane)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 5/28/10. (Anderson, S.)
May 24, 2010 Filing 22 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thererof; Proposed Order Submitted by Haitham Alyousef, Pemex, Inc., Petroleos Mexicano. (Christoff, Annie)
May 24, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SETTING: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE has been set for TUESDAY,6/15/2010 at 10:30 AM in RM 357 - Third Floor, Federal Bldg - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. (bvh)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED Order granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants' responsive pleading is due on or before May 24, 2010. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 5/12/10. (Anderson, S.)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 5/12/10. (Anderson, S.)
May 10, 2010 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Notice of Correction, #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by All Defendants. (Hershberger, John)
May 10, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Hershberger on behalf of All Defendants (Hershberger, John)
May 7, 2010 Filing 18 Filing fee: PAID $ 100, receipt number M123856 (vjm)
May 7, 2010 Filing 17 Filing fee: PAID $ 100, receipt number M123855 (vjm)
May 7, 2010 Filing 14 Filing fee: PAID $ 100, receipt number M123858. Pro Hac Vice for Walter B. Stillwell. (vjm)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Walter B. Stillwell. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 5/7/10. (Anderson, S.)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Anna Kurian Shaw. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 5/7/10. (Anderson, S.)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Raymond A. Kurz. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 5/7/10. (Anderson, S.)
May 6, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION for Walter B. Stillwell for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Petroleos Mexicano. Filed by John Golwen. Proposed order submitted. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(vjm)
May 6, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave for Anna Kurian Shaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by John Golwen for Petroleos Mexicano. Proposed order submitted (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(vjm)
May 6, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION for Raymond A. Kurz for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Petroleos Mexicano. Proposed order submitted. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(vjm)
May 5, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE by Petroleos Mexicano of Firm Name Change (Christoff, Annie)
April 13, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Petroleos Mexicano as to Haitham Alyousef. (Golwen, John)
April 13, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Petroleos Mexicano as to Pemex, Inc.. (Golwen, John)
April 6, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Haitham Alyousef, Pemex, Inc. (Documents will be picked-up at clerk's office intake). (ehg)
April 5, 2010 Filing 3 Notice of Correction to #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Pemex Gas Stations in Mexico, #3 Exhibit B - Unauthorized Pemex Gas Stations, #4 Exhibit C - Business Cards, #5 Exhibit D - 01/25/10 Cease and Desist Letter)(Golwen, John)
April 2, 2010 Filing 2 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 350, receipt number M123343 (vjm)
April 2, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Haitham Alyousef, Pemex, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.), filed by Petroleos Mexicano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Pemex Gas Stations in Mexico, #2 Exhibit "B" Unauthorized Pemex Gas Stations, #3 Exhibit "C", #4 "D", #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 judges' card)(agj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petroleos Mexicano v. Pemex, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petroleos Mexicano
Represented By: Anna Kurian Shaw
Represented By: Annie Tauer Christoff
Represented By: Raymond A. Kurz
Represented By: Walter B. Stillwell
Represented By: John S. Golwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pemex, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Hershberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haitham Alyousef
Represented By: John R. Hershberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?