Katsotis v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Peter G Katsotis
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Not Classified By Court: Jimmy Moore
Case Number: 2:2010cv02883
Filed: December 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2012 Filing 91 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/27/2012. (Anderson, S.)
July 6, 2012 Filing 90 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Ford Motor Company, Peter G Katsotis. (Patel, Vanessa)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER finding as moot #72 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/16/12. (Anderson, S.)
March 15, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE of Settlement by Ford Motor Company, Peter G Katsotis (Patel, Vanessa)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER granting #86 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/24/12. (Anderson, S.)
February 23, 2012 Filing 86 MOTION to Amend/Correct Modify Amended Scheduling Order by Ford Motor Company. (Patel, Vanessa)
February 10, 2012 Filing 85 Certificate of of Service by Peter G Katsotis. (Gerber, Richard)
February 10, 2012 Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion re #80 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Dolores Katsotis filed by Ford Motor Company. (Patel, Vanessa)
February 10, 2012 Filing 83 Certificate of of Service by Peter G Katsotis. (Gerber, Richard)
February 1, 2012 Filing 82 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ron Holle by Peter G Katsotis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gerber, Richard)
January 30, 2012 Filing 81 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Engle by Peter G Katsotis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gerber, Richard)
January 27, 2012 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #72 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Dolores Katsoti filed by Peter G Katsotis. (Gerber, Richard)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 1/27/12. (Anderson, S.)
January 26, 2012 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #72 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Dolores Katsoti Amended Certification of Consultation by Richard D. Gerber on behalf of Peter G Katsotis (Gerber, Richard)
January 26, 2012 Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #72 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Dolores Katsoti Proposed Order Submitted by Peter G Katsotis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gerber, Richard)
January 24, 2012 Filing 76 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Engle by Peter G Katsotis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gerber, Richard)
January 13, 2012 Filing 75 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 5/29/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2012. (tlh)
January 9, 2012 Filing 74 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Larry Helton by Peter G Katsotis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gerber, Richard)
December 28, 2011 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Support re #72 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Dolores Katsoti filed by Ford Motor Company. (Patel, Vanessa)
December 28, 2011 Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Dolores Katsoti by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Ford's Motion to Dismiss)(Patel, Vanessa)
December 28, 2011 Filing 71 ANSWER to #70 Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Peter Katsotis by Ford Motor Company.(Patel, Vanessa)
December 14, 2011 Filing 70 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by Peter G Katsotis. (Gerber, Richard)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order and Order Granting Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/12/11. (Anderson, S.)
October 6, 2011 Filing 68 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Corporate representative of Ford Motor Company by Peter G Katsotis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gerber, Richard)
September 23, 2011 Filing 67 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #58 Notice to Take Deposition Response and Objections to Plaintiff's Notice to Take Deposition (Patel, Vanessa)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #60 Motion to Amend/Correct and Continuing Trial. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/21/11. (Anderson, S.)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #41 Motion to Stay; finding as moot #44 Motion to Compel; finding as moot #44 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 9/14/2011. (Claxton, Charmiane)
September 8, 2011 Filing 64 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #56 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, Response in Opposition (Patel, Vanessa)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/8/11. (Anderson, S.)
September 8, 2011 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re #60 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #30 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Amended Scheduling Order proposed order submitted (Patel, Vanessa)
September 8, 2011 Filing 61 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #60 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #30 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Amended Scheduling Order proposed order submitted filed by Peter G Katsotis, Ford Motor Company has been filed. For future reference, please note A "certificate of service" is still required as to all filed documents. Filer is required to submit a certificate of service as to this document. (ehg)
September 7, 2011 Filing 60 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #30 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Amended Scheduling Order proposed order submitted by Ford Motor Company, Peter G Katsotis. (Patel, Vanessa)
August 29, 2011 Filing 59 First MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Add Additional Party Plaintiff. Proposed Order Submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Patel, Vanessa)
August 29, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ford Motor Company corporate designee by Peter G Katsotis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gerber, Richard)
August 22, 2011 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton: Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Designation of Experts (DE#41 ) and Motion to Compel & First Motion for Sanctions (DE#44 ) held on 8/22/2011. Counsel for the parties present. Most items in the Motion to Compel have been resolved. Additional documents have been produced and are being reviewed along with more narrowed request being made. Plaintiff would like to take corporate depositions then produce expert reports. Defendant argues that Plaintiff has not been diligent in seeking production of the documents and cancelled a scheduled deposition of a corporate representative. Defendant believes that an extension will prejudice Ford. The Court orders that Plaintiff is to make expert designations by 9/2/2011 with Defendant being able to supplement. As to DE#41 the Court will Grant in Part, Deny in Part. As to DE#44 - The parties have resolved the issues in the Motion. Counsel for the Plaintiff is to draft the Order, circulate to counsel and submit to the Court for final approval and entry. (Plaintiffs Counsel: T. Cates. Defendants Counsel: V. Patel.) (Tape #FTR CR5) (cas)
August 19, 2011 Filing 56 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Peter G Katsotis re #55 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Supplement First Amended Complaint)(Gerber, Richard)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying #33 Motion to Add Dolores Katsotis as an Additional Party Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 8/5/2010. (Claxton, Charmiane)
August 2, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE OF SETTING: A MOTION HEARING regarding DE# 41 and 44 has been set for 8/22/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. (bvh)
July 26, 2011 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton: Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Add Additional Parties (DE#33 ) held on 7/26/2011. Counsel for the parties present via telelphone. Plaintiff states that adding the additional party will not change and claims in the matter. Defendant agrues that the new party will be bringing new additional damages claims. After hearing argument the Court will take the matter under advisement and enter an Order. (Plaintiffs Counsel: Richard Gerber & Taylor Cates. Defendants Counsel: Robert Chapski & Vanessa Patel.) (Tape #CD) (cas)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #41 MOTION to Stay Designation of Experts Until Defendant Produces its Corporate Representatives filed by Peter G Katsotis, #44 First MOTION to Compel Defendant FordFirst MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Ford filed by Peter G Katsotis. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/26/11. (Anderson, S.)
July 25, 2011 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION to Stay Designation of Experts Until Defendant Produces its Corporate Representatives filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Patel, Vanessa)
July 25, 2011 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 First MOTION to Compel Defendant FordFirst MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Ford filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Patel, Vanessa)
July 25, 2011 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply, #33 Amended MOTION Motion to Add Dolores Katsotis as an Additional Party Plaintiff Sur-Reply filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Patel, Vanessa)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to File. Movant shall file its sur-reply no later than 5pm, July 25, 2011. ***TEXT ORDER ONLY*** Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 7/25/2011. (Claxton, Charmiane)
July 22, 2011 Filing 47 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #46 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Ford Motor Company has been filed. Filer does not indicate if a proposed order has been submitted to the judge. If filer has not already done so, please submit the proposed order to the Judge via e-mail in word format. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (ehg)
July 21, 2011 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - email responses, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - email response)(Patel, Vanessa)
July 15, 2011 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Peter G Katsotis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gerber, Richard)
July 14, 2011 Filing 44 First MOTION to Compel Defendant Ford, First MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Ford by Peter G Katsotis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Consultation, #4 Memorandum in Support of Plt's Motion to Compel and Motion for Sanctions)(Gerber, Richard)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply. Reply shall be filed on or before July 18, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 7/14/2011. (Claxton, Charmiane)
July 14, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion - Proposed order submitted by Peter G Katsotis. (Gerber, Richard)
July 14, 2011 Filing 41 MOTION to Stay Designation of Experts Until Defendant Produces its Corporate Representatives by Peter G Katsotis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Gerber, Richard)
July 13, 2011 Filing 40 REVISED NOTICE OF SETTING AS TO TIME ONLY: The TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING regarding DE# 33 which is set for TUESDAY, 7/26/2011 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton has been CHANGED to TUESDAY, 7/26/2011 at 02:00 PM. PLEASE NOTE the Time Change.*****TEXT ENTRY ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WTIH NOTICE.******(bvh)
July 13, 2011 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SETTING: A TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING regarding DE# 33 has been set for TUESDAY, 7/26/2011 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. (bvh)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #33 Amended MOTION Motion to Add Dolores Katsotis as an Additional Party Plaintiff filed by Peter G Katsotis. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/8/11. (Anderson, S.)
July 8, 2011 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 Amended MOTION Motion to Add Dolores Katsotis as an Additional Party Plaintiff filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Motion)(Patel, Vanessa)
July 5, 2011 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Chapski on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Chapski, Robert)
June 29, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE by Peter G Katsotis Certificate of Service (Gerber, Richard)
June 24, 2011 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support re #33 Amended MOTION Motion to Add Dolores Katsotis as an Additional Party Plaintiff filed by Peter G Katsotis. (Gerber, Richard)
June 24, 2011 Filing 33 Amended MOTION Motion to Add Dolores Katsotis as an Additional Party Plaintiff by Peter G Katsotis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gerber, Richard)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #31 Motion to Add Party. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/23/11. (Anderson, S.)
June 22, 2011 Filing 31 MOTION Add Dolores Katsotis as an Additional Party Plaintiff Proposed Order Submitted by Peter G Katsotis. (Gerber, Richard)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/1/11. (Anderson, S.)
May 25, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Peter Katsotis by Ford Motor Company.(Patel, Vanessa)
May 25, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Delores Katsotis by Ford Motor Company.(Patel, Vanessa)
May 24, 2011 Filing 27 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #26 Notice (Other) filed by Ford Motor Company, #25 Notice (Other) filed by Ford Motor Company has been filed. Please note the incorrect event relief was used. Under the heading of "Discovery Documents", use "Notice to Take Deposition". Filer is required to resubmit documents. (ehg)
May 17, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company Deposition of Peter G. Katsotis (Patel, Vanessa)
May 17, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Deposition of Delores Katsotis (Patel, Vanessa)
May 9, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Fire Inspector Paul Witt by Peter G Katsotis.(Gerber, Richard)
May 9, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Corporate Designee(s) of Ford Motor Company by Peter G Katsotis.(Gerber, Richard)
May 5, 2011 Filing 22 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #21 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Scheduling Order filed by Peter G Katsotis, Ford Motor Company has been filed. For future reference, please note A proposed order is required. If filer has not already done so, please submit the proposed order to the Judge via e-mail in word format. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (ehg)
May 2, 2011 Filing 21 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Scheduling Order by Ford Motor Company, Peter G Katsotis. (Gerber, Richard)
April 27, 2011 Filing 20 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #18 Interrogatories Propounded filed by Peter G Katsotis, #19 Request for Production of Documents filed by Peter G Katsotis has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Pursuant to LR26.1, Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission shall not be filed, except as allowed by LR26.1(a)(30 or LR26.1(b). The filer is not required to resubmit this document. (ehg)
April 26, 2011 Filing 19 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Peter G Katsotis.(Gerber, Richard)
April 26, 2011 Filing 18 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Defendand Ford Motor Company by Peter G Katsotis.(Gerber, Richard)
April 26, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE by Peter G Katsotis Certificate of Serivce (Gerber, Richard)
April 5, 2011 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 12/12/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/22/2011. (tlh)
March 22, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE by Peter G Katsotis Certificate of Service - Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Second Set of Request for Admissions (Gerber, Richard)
February 18, 2011 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2011. Discovery due by 9/1/2011. Joinder of Parties due by 4/29/2011. Initial Motions to Dismiss due by 6/1/2011. Filing Dispositive Motions 9/16/2011. (ehg)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER. Entry of this order CANCELS the scheduling conference set for TUESDAY, 2/22/2011 at 10:45 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 2/18/2011. (Claxton, Charmiane)
February 11, 2011 Filing 13 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #12 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Peter G Katsotis has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Incorrect event relief used. Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed. Proposed orders are always submitted to the Judge via e-mail in word format. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (ehg)
February 9, 2011 Filing 12 Proposed Pretrial Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Appear by Telephone by Peter G Katsotis. (Gerber, Richard)
February 9, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear By Telephone at the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference proposed order submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Patel, Vanessa)
February 8, 2011 Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone filed by Peter G Katsotis has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: A proposed order is required as to this motion. See LR7.2. If filer has not already done so, please submit the proposed order to the Judge via e-mail in word format. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (ehg)
February 3, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone by Peter G Katsotis. (Gerber, Richard)
January 28, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SETTING: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE has been set for TUESDAY, 2/22/2011 at 10:45 AM in RM 357 - Third Floor, Federal Bldg - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. (bvh)
January 24, 2011 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added as referral judge in accordance with Magistrate Judge Equalization Report. (Nabors, Willie)
December 15, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa A. Patel on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Patel, Vanessa)
December 15, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Randolph Bibb, Jr on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Bibb, John)
December 10, 2010 Filing 4 Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
December 10, 2010 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Bibb, John)
December 10, 2010 Filing 2 ATTACHMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Written Notice to Adverse Parties)(Bibb, John)
December 10, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from Shelby Circuit, case number CT-001726-01 (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0651-1182816), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal)(Bibb, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katsotis v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter G Katsotis
Represented By: Richard D. Gerber
Represented By: Taylor A. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Robert F. Chapski
Represented By: Vanessa A. Patel
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?