Orlowski et al v. Bates et al
Plaintiff: Damian Orlowski, Lynn Cechin, Orrin Conklin, Marjean Conklin and Judith Ponder
Defendant: Larry Bates, First American Monetary Consultants, Inc., Information Radio Network/IRN USA Radio News, Information Radio Network, Inc., John Doe, C, John Doe, B, John Doe, A, Jane Doe, A, Jane Doe, B, Jane Doe, C, Barbara Bates, Charles Bates, Robert Bates, Kinsey Brown Bates and Cecila K Standley
Receiver: John L. Ryder
Case Number: 2:2011cv01396
Filed: December 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Hardeman
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G. Claxton
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER granting Larry Bates' Oral Motion for Sufficient Bond and denying 576 Motion in Response to Notice of Filing Amended Bond. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/4/2016. (McCalla, Jon)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER denying 431 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/25/2016. (McCalla, Jon)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER denying 549 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 1/20/2016. (Claxton, Charmiane)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER denying 513 Motion to Dismiss Prejudgment Attachment; denying 514 Motion to Stay; denying 514 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 521 Motion to Dismiss Prejudgment Attachment; denying 532 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 11/30/2015. (McCalla, Jon)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER denying 522 Motion Objecting to Issuance of Subpoenas; granting 533 Sealed Motion to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 11/19/2015. (Claxton, Charmiane)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 438 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 491 Defendants Barbara Bates and Larry Bates' Motion for Dismissal and Sanctions. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 11/18/2015. (McCalla, Jon)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER denying 506 Motion to Stay; denying 506 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Continuing the Trial Date. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/26/2015. (McCalla, Jon)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER granting 459 Motion to Continue the Prejudgment Attachment; denying 474 Motion for Relief from Attachment; finding as moot 476 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 477 Motion for Negative Inference; denying 497 Motion to Nullify Prejudgment Attachment and Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/20/2015. (McCalla, Jon)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 300 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/31/2015. (McCalla, Jon)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orlowski et al v. Bates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Monetary Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Information Radio Network/IRN USA Radio News
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Information Radio Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe, A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe, B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe, C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Bates
Represented By: T. Tarry Beasley, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bates
Represented By: T. Tarry Beasley, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinsey Brown Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecila K Standley
Represented By: Randall J. Fishman
Represented By: Richard S. Townley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Orlowski
Represented By: Charles A. Brasfield
Represented By: J. Houston Gordon
Represented By: David Honigman
Represented By: Josh Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Gerard V Mantese
Represented By: Amber Griffin Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Cechin
Represented By: J. Houston Gordon
Represented By: David Honigman
Represented By: Josh Paul Lushnat
Represented By: Gerard V Mantese
Represented By: Amber Griffin Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orrin Conklin
Represented By: J. Houston Gordon
Represented By: Amber Griffin Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjean Conklin
Represented By: J. Houston Gordon
Represented By: Amber Griffin Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Ponder
Represented By: J. Houston Gordon
Represented By: Amber Griffin Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: John L. Ryder
Represented By: Caroline Lee Giovannetti
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Represented By: John L. Ryder
Represented By: Caroline Lee Giovannetti
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?