Knox v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Steven Hollis Knox
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 2:2012cv02028
Filed: January 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Lauderdale
Presiding Judge: James D. Todd
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 27 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 7/20/2020. (mbm)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF FEES AND COSTS UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT 24 . Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 6/22/2015. (Todd, James)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REVERSING COMMISSIONER'S DECISION AND REMANDING PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR OF 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 3/23/15. (Todd, James)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hollis Knox
Represented By: Charles E. Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?