Zarecor et al v. Morgan Keegan & Company Inc
Plaintiff: Mona Zarecor, Herschel Zarecor, III and Herschel Zarecor
Defendant: Morgan Keegan & Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv02341
Filed: May 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Diane K. Vescovo
Presiding Judge: Samuel H. Mays
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 29 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 05/28/2013.
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 16 Motion to Reassign Case; ORDER denying 17 Motion to Reassign Case. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on February 28, 2013.
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRANSFER ORDER, transferring this case to the Western District of Tennessee to be included in MDL No. 2009, in re: REGIONS MORGAN KEEGAN SECURITIES, DERIVATIVE AND EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT INCOME SECURITY ACT (ERISA) LITIGATION. Signed by Kathryn H. Vratil, Acting Chairman, MDL Panel. (vjt) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 5/1/2012.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zarecor et al v. Morgan Keegan & Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona Zarecor
Represented By: Peter Drake Mann
Represented By: Howard B. Prossnitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herschel Zarecor, III
Represented By: Peter Drake Mann
Represented By: Howard B. Prossnitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herschel Zarecor
Represented By: Howard B. Prossnitz
Represented By: Peter Drake Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Keegan & Company Inc
Represented By: David B. Vandergriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?