Maverick Group Marketing, Inc. v. Worx Environmental Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Maverick Group Marketing, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Worx Environmental Products, Inc. |
Miscellaneous: |
Chancery Court Clerk and Master |
Counter_claimant: |
Worx Environmental Products, Inc. |
Counter_defendant: |
Maverick Group Marketing, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv02268 |
Filed: |
May 1, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Memphis Office |
County: |
Shelby |
Presiding Judge: |
Tu M. Pham |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 10, 2016 |
Filing
131
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/10/2016. (Anderson, S.)
|
December 8, 2015 |
Filing
119
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/7/2015. (Anderson, S.)
|
April 9, 2015 |
Filing
78
ORDER denying 56 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/9/15. (Anderson, S.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Maverick Group Marketing, Inc. v. Worx Environmental Products, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Maverick Group Marketing, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Malcolm B. Futhey, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Worx Environmental Products, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Ahsaki Baptist |
Represented By: |
Robert E. Craddock, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Amber D. Floyd |
Represented By: |
Matthew F. Jones |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Miscellaneous: Chancery Court Clerk and Master |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Worx Environmental Products, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Ahsaki Baptist |
Represented By: |
Robert E. Craddock, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Amber D. Floyd |
Represented By: |
Matthew F. Jones |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Maverick Group Marketing, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Malcolm B. Futhey, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?