Simpson v. CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems
Plaintiff: Mr. Jeffrey Simpson
Defendant: CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems
Not Classified By Court: Jimmy Moore
Case Number: 2:2017cv02488
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2017 Filing 32 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/22/17. (Lipman, Sheryl)
November 22, 2017 Filing 31 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice [JOINT] by CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems. (Marchetti, L.)
October 11, 2017 Filing 30 MEDIATION CERTIFICATION (Lait, Hayden)
September 29, 2017 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems. (Marchetti, L.)
September 29, 2017 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems. (Marchetti, L.)
September 29, 2017 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Compel Initial Rule 26 Disclosures filed by CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit C to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit D to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures, #5 Exhibit E to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures, #6 Exhibit F to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures)(Marchetti, L.)
September 29, 2017 Filing 26 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #22 #23 #24 and #25 . However, the following deficiency has been found: Attorney's log in and password must match the electronic signature on documents published. Proposed order are not to be published to CM/ECF, but only emailed to the presiding judge's chambers. If no proposed order has been emailed, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
September 28, 2017 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems. (Marchetti, L.)
September 28, 2017 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Marchetti, L.)
September 28, 2017 Filing 23 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #22 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, by CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems.. (Marchetti, L.)
September 28, 2017 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Compel Initial Rule 26 Disclosures filed by CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit C to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit D to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures, #5 Exhibit E to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures, #6 Exhibit F to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures)(Marchetti, L.)
September 16, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's motion to dismiss by Jeffrey Simpson. (Tooten, Terrell)
September 14, 2017 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Jeffrey Simpson. (Tooten, Terrell)
September 14, 2017 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey Simpson. (Tooten, Terrell)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/8/17. (Lipman, Sheryl)
September 14, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to Compel Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Jeffrey Simpson. (Tooten, Terrell)
September 14, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Jeffrey Simpson. (Tooten, Terrell)
August 10, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE by Jeffrey Simpson re #13 Scheduling Order Notice of Service (Tooten, Terrell)
August 4, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MEDIATION STATUS by CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems (Marchetti, L.)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 7/26/17. (Lipman, Sheryl)
July 26, 2017 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 7/16/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Pretrial Conference set for Tuesday, 7/3/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/26/2018. (jpw)
July 26, 2017 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference held on 7/26/2017. Terrell Tooten appearing for the Plaintiff. L. Gino Marchetti and James W. Seegers (via telephone) appearing for the Defense. Jury Trial set for Monday, 7/16/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 2-3 days. Pretrial Conference set for Tuesday, 7/3/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/26/2018. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Cathy Best) (jpw)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED**.] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 7/24/17. (Lipman, Sheryl)
July 24, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0651-2592485) by CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Goodstanding Supreme Court of Florida, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Goodstanding U.S. District Court of Florida, Middle District)(Marchetti, L.)
July 20, 2017 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Tooten, Terrell)
July 20, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems. (Michels, Charles)
July 14, 2017 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 7/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (jpw)
July 13, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 13, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 13, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 13, 2017 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
July 13, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems from Circuit Court for Shelby County, Tennessee, case number CT-002515-17 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0651-2585074), filed by CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Coversheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint Filed with State Court)(Marchetti, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEP Recycled Pallet Solutions, LLC, a/k/a IFCO Systems
Represented By: L. Gino Marchetti
Represented By: L. Gino Marchetti, Jr.
Represented By: James W. Seegers
Represented By: Charles S. Michels, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jeffrey Simpson
Represented By: Terrell L. Tooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?