The Porter Casino Resort, Inc. v. Georgia Gaming Investment, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: The Porter Casino Resort, Inc.
Defendant: Georgia Gaming Investment, LLC and Tennessee Holding Investments, LLC
Miscellaneous: Donna Russell
Case Number: 2:2018cv02231
Filed: April 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Diane K. Vescovo
Presiding Judge: Samuel H. Mays
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 07/30/2019.
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 09/21/2018.
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER requiring Defendants to submit evidence sufficient to establish that there is complete diversity between Plaintiff and Defendants within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 6/28/2018. (Mays, Samuel)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Porter Casino Resort, Inc. v. Georgia Gaming Investment, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Porter Casino Resort, Inc.
Represented By: Carl I. Jacobson
Represented By: Jonathan P. Lakey
Represented By: Anthony Charles Pietrangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Gaming Investment, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Michael Harris
Represented By: Christopher Chad Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Holding Investments, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Michael Harris
Represented By: Christopher Chad Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Donna Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?