Allison et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al

Plaintiff: The Estate of Deborah Allison and James Allison
Defendant: Pacesetter, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC and Abbott Laboratories
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Case Number: 2:2018cv02432
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Withdrawing DE #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Granting DE #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 7/31/18. (Fowlkes, John)
July 30, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 Amended Complaint, Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Their Pending Motion to Dismiss as Moot, and for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Proposed Order Submitted) by All Defendants. (Hudson, Eric)
July 20, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Settle, Dewun)
July 20, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MANUFACTURING DEFECT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Settle, Dewun)
July 20, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Abbott Laboratories, Pacesetter, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC. (Ring, Daniel)
July 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E. Tauber on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Pacesetter, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC (Tauber, Andrew)
July 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L Ring on behalf of Abbott Laboratories, Pacesetter, Inc., St. Jude Medical, LLC (Ring, Daniel)
June 29, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - FDA PMA P950022S014, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2002-3-11 S014, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2003-1-22 S015, #5 Exhibit 5 - FDA PMA P950022S015, #6 Exhibit 6 - FDA PMA P950022S024, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2005-6-3 S024, #8 Exhibit 8 - Abbott Form 8-K)(Hudson, Eric)
June 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants. (Hudson, Eric)
June 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle R. Cummins on behalf of All Defendants (Cummins, Kyle)
June 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
June 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Shelby County, TN, case number CT-002181-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2820997), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - LLC Entity Details, #3 Exhibit C - Form 8-K, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hudson, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allison et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacesetter, Inc.
Represented By: Eric E. Hudson
Represented By: Kyle R. Cummins
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, LLC
Represented By: Eric E. Hudson
Represented By: Kyle R. Cummins
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Eric E. Hudson
Represented By: Kyle R. Cummins
Represented By: Andrew E. Tauber
Represented By: Daniel L Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Deborah Allison
Represented By: Dewun R. Settle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Allison
Represented By: Dewun R. Settle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?