Edwards v. Mobley et al
Plaintiff: Sheila Edwards
Defendant: Tic Tac Trucking, LLC and Michael Mobley
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Case Number: 2:2018cv02479
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 09/04/2018. (Parker, Thomas)
August 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Michael Mobley, Tic Tac Trucking, LLC of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Rickman, Brian)
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Sheila Edwards Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Dennis, Jacob )
August 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Chadwick Rickman on behalf of All Defendants (Rickman, Brian)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/2/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Jury Trial (3 days) set for 8/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker; Scheduling Conference held on 8/17/2018. Jacob Dennis, II appeared for the Plaintiff. B. Chad Rucker appeared for the Defendants. The parties provided their theory of the case. Plaintiff's injuries are mostly to her spine and lower back area. Defendants stated the case will be about liability and damages. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/2/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Jury Trial (3 days) set for 8/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court Reporter, Cathy Best)(mlk)
July 27, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Slager, Jennifer)
July 25, 2018 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Slager, Jennifer)
July 18, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tic Tac Trucking, LLC. (Slager, Jennifer)
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Tennessee, case number CT-002839-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2833711), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Slager, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Mobley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tic Tac Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Sutch Slager
Represented By: Brian Chadwick Rickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mobley
Represented By: Jennifer Sutch Slager
Represented By: Brian Chadwick Rickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Edwards
Represented By: Jacob J. Dennis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?