Baskin et al v. American Queen Steamboat Operating Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Sandra Baskin and Lloyd Baskin
Defendant: American Queen Steamboat Operating Company, LLC f/k/a Great American Steamboat Company, LLC and American Queen Steamboat Operationg Company,LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02487
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Queen Steamboat Operationg Company,LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Queen Holdings, LLC for American Queen Steamboat Operationg Company,LLC.. (Bratton, G.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by American Queen Steamboat Operationg Company,LLC.(Bratton, G.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Ray Bratton on behalf of American Queen Steamboat Operationg Company,LLC (Bratton, G.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elissa Mulrooney Coombs on behalf of American Queen Steamboat Operationg Company,LLC (Coombs, Elissa)
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Queen Steamboat Operationg Company,LLC, filed by Lloyd Baskin, Sandra Baskin.(Bloomfield, Lee)
July 19, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to COGENCY GLOBAL INC.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
July 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Lloyd Baskin, Sandra Baskin has been filed. For future reference, please note the civil cover sheet should have the s/signature.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lloyd Baskin, Sandra Baskin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bloomfield, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baskin et al v. American Queen Steamboat Operating Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Queen Steamboat Operating Company, LLC f/k/a Great American Steamboat Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Queen Steamboat Operationg Company,LLC
Represented By: Elissa Mulrooney Coombs
Represented By: G. Ray Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Baskin
Represented By: Lee J. Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Baskin
Represented By: Lee J. Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?