Buckley v. DaVita Inc.

Plaintiff: Angela Buckley
Defendant: DaVita Inc.
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Case Number: 2:2018cv02552
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/11/2018. (Fowlkes, John)
October 11, 2018 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Status Conference set for 2/15/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. (wrh)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/15/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. ADR deadline is 1/11/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 11/5/2018. Discovery due by 3/8/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 11/5/2019. Motions due by 4/9/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/11/2018. (Fowlkes, John)
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 10/11/2018. Counsel for Plaintiff, Turrell L. Tooten present in Court; Defense counsel Brittany Stancombe Hopper present telephonically. Parties updated the Court as to the status of the case; working towards a resolution. The Court sets an Early Mediation deadline of January 11, 2019, order to be entered. The Court accepts the proposed Scheduling Order, order to be entered. Case set Friday, 02/15/2019 at 9:00 a.m. for Status Conference. (Court Reporter Lynn Dudley.) (wrh)
August 29, 2018 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (pyb)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by DaVita Inc..(Hopper, Brittany)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Peters on behalf of DaVita Inc. (Peters, Mark)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by DaVita Inc. has been filed. For future reference, please note, use your s/signature on the civil cover sheet. See ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DaVita Inc. identifying Other Affiliate ISD Renal, Inc. for DaVita Inc... (Hopper, Brittany)
August 14, 2018 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by DaVita Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee (Hopper, Brittany)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DaVita Inc. from Circuit Court of Shelby County, case number CT-003012-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2855330), filed by DaVita Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - State Court Pleadings, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(Hopper, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckley v. DaVita Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Buckley
Represented By: Terrell L. Tooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DaVita Inc.
Represented By: Brittany Stancombe Hopper
Represented By: Mark W. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?