DCC Rearentals LLC v. Edwards

Plaintiff: DCC Rearentals LLC
Defendant: Cidney Edwards
Undetermined: Edward L. Stanton, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02563
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
0 Judge: Thomas L Parker
1 Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Adopting #10 the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/11/18. (jgb)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite Status Conference by DCC Rearentals LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Expedited Motion for Status Conference)(McNary, Brandon)
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Cidney Edwards. Objections to R&R due by 9/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 8/21/2018. (Pham, Tu)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 8/21/2018. (Pham, Tu)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand Proposed Order Submitted by DCC Rearentals LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Remand)(McNary, Brandon)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Franklin McNary on behalf of DCC Rearentals LLC (McNary, Brandon)
August 16, 2018 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters, including screening of the complaint to determine whether or not summons shall be issued by the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and Local Rule 4.1(b)(2) (csf)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE: Declined agreement to receive notice of electronic filing (NEF) by Cidney Edwards (csf)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cidney Edwards. (csf)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cidney Edwards from Shelby County Court of General Sessions, case number 1939033., filed by Cidney Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Shelby County Court of General Sessions case 1939033, #2 Defendant's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DCC Rearentals LLC v. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cidney Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCC Rearentals LLC
Represented By: Brandon Franklin McNary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Edward L. Stanton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?