Bachus et al v. Pruitt et al
Plaintiff: Carla Bachus and Kendrick E. Bachus
Defendant: Arlen Pruitt and New Prime, Inc
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Case Number: 2:2018cv02585
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial (2 days)set for 10/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/13/2019. (mlk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker; Scheduling Conference held on 10/9/2018. Bill Wade appeared for the Plaintiffs. John Tarpley appeared via telephone for the Defendants. This matter arose from a truck accident. The Plaintiffs had soft tissue injuries. The parties stated there will be no e-discovery in this case. Jury Trial (2 days)set for 10/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/13/2019. (Court Reporter, Cathy Best) (mlk)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/9/2018. (Parker, Thomas)
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER Granting #10 Joint Motion to Appear Telephonically. Please call 877-336-1839; access code 6517215. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/8/18. (jgb)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear By Telephone by New Prime, Inc, Arlen Pruitt. (Tarpley, John)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 10/9/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by New Prime, Inc.(Tarpley, John)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arlen Pruitt.(Tarpley, John)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Prime, Inc, Arlen Pruitt from Shelby County, case number CT-003309-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2865480), filed by New Prime, Inc, Arlen Pruitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Tarpley, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bachus et al v. Pruitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Bachus
Represented By: Bill Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick E. Bachus
Represented By: Bill Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlen Pruitt
Represented By: John R. Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Prime, Inc
Represented By: John R. Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?