Flowers v. The Troxel Company et al
Plaintiff: Veronica Flowers
Defendant: Fastenal Company and The Troxel Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv02639
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE by The Troxel Company interrogatories and document requests have been served upon the plaintiff (Estep, Garrett)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CLARIFYING CASE STATUS. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/13/2018. (shl)
November 9, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Fastenal Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email 092618, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Email 102318, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Email 110518, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - 110718)(Cassidy, Thomas)
November 8, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE by Veronica Flowers (Nauman, Steven)
November 8, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Fastenal Company.(Cassidy, Thomas)
November 8, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Cassidy, Jr on behalf of Fastenal Company (Cassidy, Thomas)
November 8, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett Hunter O'Brien on behalf of Fastenal Company (O'Brien, Garrett)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Response due by 11/21/2018. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/7/2018. (shl)
November 7, 2018 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Troxel Company. (Estep, Garrett)
November 7, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Answer to the Complaint by The Troxel Company.(Estep, Garrett)
November 7, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by Veronica Flowers (Nauman, Steven)
November 6, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick G. Walker on behalf of The Troxel Company (Walker, Patrick)
October 26, 2018 Filing 17 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 11/30/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/18/18. (Lipman, Sheryl)
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Veronica Flowers. (Nauman, Steven)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Nauman failed to provide the Court with a Certificate of Good Standing from the highest Court of a state or the District of Columbia, AND from a United States District Court, as required under Local Rule 83.4(d)(1)(A). Mr. Nauman may resubmit his motion after he has complied with the local rules. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/17/18. (Lipman, Sheryl)
October 17, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2905305) by Veronica Flowers. (Nauman, Steven)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/11/2018. (shl)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by The Troxel Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Troxel Company Supporting Its Motion for Additional Time to Answer the Complaint)(Estep, Garrett)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Flowers as to The Troxel Company. (Hackett, William)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Flowers as to Fastenal Company. (Hackett, William)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Fastenal Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to The Troxel Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Veronica Flowers has been filed. For future reference, please note: Civil cover sheet contains wet signature. All documents submitted by counsel must contain electronic signature of the filer. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2881601), filed by Veronica Flowers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Troxel Company, #3 Summons Summons Fastenal Company)(Hackett, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. The Troxel Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fastenal Company
Represented By: Thomas P. Cassidy, Jr.
Represented By: Garrett Hunter O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Troxel Company
Represented By: Patrick G. Walker
Represented By: Garrett M. Estep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Flowers
Represented By: William Thomas Hackett
Represented By: Steven Nauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?