Scroggins v. C&W Leasing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Scroggins
Defendant: Earnest Owens, C&W Leasing Corporation and Huseman Logistics, Inc.
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Case Number: 2:2018cv02640
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Correction to #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of MSJ)(Schroeck, Christopher)
November 13, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by C&W Leasing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of MSJ, #2 Exhibit Holliday v Epperson, #3 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Vic Corley)(Schroeck, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by Nathan Scroggins Plaintiff's NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULE 26(a)(1) INTIAL DISCLOSURES (Marshall, Steven)
October 29, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by C&W Leasing Corporation.(Phillips, J. Britt)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/23/18. (shl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Huseman Logistics, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
October 23, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Summons by Steven Marshall on behalf of Nathan Scroggins. (Marshall, Steven)
October 23, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Nathan Scroggins.(Marshall, Steven)
October 23, 2018 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 11/18/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 11/1/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/25/2019. (tlh)
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2018. Steven Marshall appearing for the Plaintiff. Christopher James Schroeck appearing for the Defendant. Deadlines/Dates established: Jury Trial set for Monday, 11/18/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial estimated to take 2-3 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 11/1/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/25/2019. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Mark Dodson)(9:00-9:17) (tlh)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Schroeck, Christopher)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Punitive Damages by C&W Leasing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Fruge v Doe, #3 Exhibit Anderson v US, #4 Exhibit 2012 US Dist Lexis)(Phillips, J. Britt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Schroeck on behalf of C&W Leasing Corporation (Schroeck, Christopher)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Earnest Owens. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Summons by Steven Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Marshall, Steven)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 10/23/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by C&W Leasing Corporation has been filed. For future reference, please note ECF Policies and Proceedures 10.1 electronic signature. Next time please make sure to use your s/signature on the civil cover sheet. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by C&W Leasing Corporation.(Phillips, J. Britt)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C&W Leasing Corporation identifying Corporate Parent C&W Leasing Corporation for C&W Leasing Corporation.. (Phillips, J. Britt)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by C&W Leasing Corporation from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-003824-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2882187), filed by C&W Leasing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit discovery, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, J. Britt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scroggins v. C&W Leasing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Scroggins
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earnest Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&W Leasing Corporation
Represented By: J. Britt Phillips
Represented By: Christopher James Schroeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huseman Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?