Brown v. Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC

Plaintiff: Jemarcus Brown
Defendant: Donald T Denz, Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Aurora Cares, LLC, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC and Norbert A Bennett
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Case Number: 2:2018cv02740
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
2 Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aurora Cares, LLC, Norbert A Bennett, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, Donald T Denz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Conley, Craig)
November 30, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jemarcus Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Acerra, Carey)
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference RESET to Wednesday, 01/09/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER [Text Only - No Image Attached]: Scheduling Conference RESET for Thursday, 12/6/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
November 21, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Conley, Craig)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE per Administrative Order 2018-30. Case reassigned to Judge Mark S. Norris for all further proceedings. Judge Sheryl H. Lipman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/20/2018. (jae)
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Jemarcus Brown. (Acerra, Carey)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #10 Response to Motion filed by Jemarcus Brown has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Electronic signature and e-filer do not match. Combination of the electronic signature and e-filer constitues a certified filing. Filer should either attach their electronic signature to the document, or the attorney whose electronic signature appears on the document should resubmit the document under their log in and password. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Arnold, Deena)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Aurora Cares, LLC, Norbert A Bennett, D&N, LLC, DTD HC, LLC, Donald T Denz. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Conley, Craig)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Conley, Craig)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 11/28/2018 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Donald T Denz, Norbert A Bennett, DTD HC, LLC, D&N, LLC, Aurora Cares, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note the civil cover sheet should have a s/signature. Please see ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-003844-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2910251), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conley, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald T Denz
Represented By: Craig C. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Craig C. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Cares, LLC
Represented By: Craig C. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&N, LLC
Represented By: Craig C. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTD HC, LLC
Represented By: Craig C. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norbert A Bennett
Represented By: Craig C. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jemarcus Brown
Represented By: Austin Gardner
Represented By: Cameron C. Jehl
Represented By: Carey Lynn Acerra
Represented By: Deena Knopf Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?