Renick v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Plaintiff: Mark Renick
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada and Union Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv02762
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting DE #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 12/28/18. (Fowlkes, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 15 Certificate of of Good Standing (Missouri Supreme Court) by Union Security Insurance Company. (Anderson, Robyn)
December 27, 2018 Filing 14 Certificate of of Good Standing (Western District of Missouri) by Union Security Insurance Company. (Anderson, Robyn)
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2954400) by Union Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Anderson, Robyn)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (pyb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Union Security Insurance Company.(Headrick, S.)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER finding as moot DE #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting DE #9 Motion signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 12/03/2018. (Fowlkes, John)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 Joint MOTION TO DROP DEFENDANTS SUN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF CANADA AND SUN LIFE FINANCIAL AND ADD UNION SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SOLE DEFENDANT Proposed Order Submitted by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Headrick, S.)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Headrick, S.)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Mark Renick has been filed. For future reference, please note the civil cover sheet has a "wet" signature. Please see ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 Electronic Signatures.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jld)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to the Commissioner of Insurance. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CTNWDC-2914770), filed by Mark Renick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dunlap, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renick v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By: S. Russell Headrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Security Insurance Company
Represented By: S. Russell Headrick
Represented By: Robyn Lyn Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Renick
Represented By: John E. Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?