Jones v. Defenders, Inc.

Plaintiff: Donna Jones
Defendant: Defenders, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02770
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
2 Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 2/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 Defenders, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Defenders, Inc..(Kisber, Zachary)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDERS, INC. #14 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/13/18. (shl)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Set Aside Default Unopposed Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defenders, Inc. and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Defenders, Inc.. (Kisber, Zachary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Tom on behalf of Defenders, Inc. (Tom, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman added. Judge Thomas L. Parker no longer assigned to case. (jae)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A. Kisber on behalf of Defenders, Inc. (Kisber, Zachary)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Subpoena by Donna Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kerney, Frank)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defenders, Inc.. Motion terminated: #8 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Donna Jones. (jae)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Donna Jones. (Kerney, Frank)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Jones as to Defenders, Inc.. (Kerney, Frank)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defenders, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defenders, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2918489), filed by Donna Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Kerney, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Defenders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defenders, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary A. Kisber
Represented By: Robert F. Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Jones
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?