Arnold v. Crossroads Hospice of Tennessee, LLC

Plaintiff: Angela Arnold
Defendant: Crossroads Hospice of Tennessee, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02779
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager.(pyb)
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Crossroads Hospice of Tennessee, LLC.(Ratton, Robert)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 12/12/18. (Fowlkes, John) (Fowlkes, John).
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) Proposed Order Submitted by Crossroads Hospice of Tennessee, LLC. (Ratton, Robert)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Arnold as to Crossroads Hospice of Tennessee, LLC. (Sheng, Elaine)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #7 Summons Issued, has been filed. Please fill in where the answer shoulld be sent on the summons before serving. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jld)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Crossroads Hospice of Tennessee, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Angela Arnold has been filed. For future reference, please note: Civil cover sheet was not completed (parties names not listed). Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crossroads Hospice of Tennessee, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2922104), filed by Angela Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Faith)(Sheng, Elaine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Crossroads Hospice of Tennessee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Arnold
Represented By: Elaine Sheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Hospice of Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: Robert W. Ratton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?