Thomas v. Tennison Brothers, Inc. et al

Appellee: Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc. and Tennison Brothers, Inc.
Appellant: William H. Thomas, Jr.
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
Case Number: 2:2018cv02794
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: Tennessee Western District Court
0 Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
1 Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 19 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William)
December 21, 2018 18 Appellee's BRIEF by Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/31/2018. (Spence, Robert)
December 12, 2018 17 Appellant's BRIEF by William H. Thomas, Jr. Appellee Brief due by 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Answer to Amended Complaint))(Thomas, William)
November 28, 2018 16 NOTICE of Appellant and Appellee Designation of Record to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee. (By email from Bankruptcy Court) (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues, #2 Appellee Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.'s Rule 8009(a)(2) Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record)(csf)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER DENYING #13 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO REPLY. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/28/2018. (shl)
November 28, 2018 14 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #13 Notice (Other) filed by William H. Thomas, Jr. has been filed. For future reference, please note : Document should have been submitted as a motion, allowing the judge to make a ruling on the request. The event will be changed to "Motion". Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
November 27, 2018 13 *Motion* filed as a NOTICE by William H. Thomas, Jr re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, Request for Permission to File Reply To Response of Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc (ECF No. 8) (Thomas, William) *Modified on 11/28/2018 to change event to "Motion" (jae).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #6 MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/26/2018. (shl)
November 25, 2018 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Response in Opposition to Motion To Modify Scheduling Order filed by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William)
November 25, 2018 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, Motion to Transfer Case to Judge Jon P. McCalla filed by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Answers to Amended Complaint))(Thomas, William)
November 24, 2018 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Extend Deadline Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (ECF #3) in Bank Bankruptcy Appeal proposed order submitted filed by Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.. (Spence, Robert)
November 23, 2018 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Reassign Case Motion to Transfer Case to Judge Jon P. McCalla proposed order submitted filed by Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tennessee Court of Appeals Ruling - Tennison Brothers, Inc. et al v. William H. Thomas, Jr, W2016-00795-COA-R3-CV)(Spence, Robert)
November 23, 2018 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc. for Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc... (Spence, Robert)
November 21, 2018 6 MOTION to Extend Deadline Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (ECF #3) in Bank Bankruptcy Appeal by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William)
November 19, 2018 5 MOTION to Reassign Case Motion to Transfer Case to Judge Jon P. McCalla by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Transfer Case)(Thomas, William)
November 15, 2018 4 Notice of Correction to #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Amended Notice of Referral of Appeal to the United States District Court, Western District of Tennessee. Amended referral to correct the chapter. (csf)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING IN BANKRUPTCY APPEAL. Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2018. (csf)
November 15, 2018 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
November 15, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-27850 (Adversary No. 16-00260). File received, filed by William H. Thomas, Jr. Appellant Brief due by 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Amended Notice of Referral of Appeal, #2 Notice of Appeal, #3 Request by Appellant for Referral of Appeal as a Related Case to U.S. District Court Judge Jon McCalla, #4 Memorandum and Order on Plaintiffs' Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7056 Motions for Summary Judgment Combined with Notice of the Entry Thereof, #5 Defendant's Emergency Motion to Extend Time for Filing Notice of Appeal, #6 Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.'s Objection to Defendant's Emergency Motion to Extend Time for Filing Notice of Appeal, #7 Order Granting Debtor's Motion to Extend Time for Filing Notice of Appeal)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Tennison Brothers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
Represented By: Kristina A. Woo
Represented By: Robert L. J. Spence, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tennison Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy Baker Tennison
Represented By: Stuart B. Breakstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: William H. Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Thomas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?