Farwell v. Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC

Plaintiff: Jacqueline Farwell
Defendant: Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2018cv02795
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
1 Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/28/18. (jjf)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC Notice of Service of Discovery (Conley, Craig)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Motion Hearing is set Friday, 4/26/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCallas chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial is set for Monday, 5/18/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 5/8/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 5/1/2020. (jrs)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/21/2018. Stephen Leffler appeared for the Plaintiff. Craig Conley appeared for the Defendant. A Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for Friday, April 26, 2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 5/18/2020. at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial is estimated to last 5-6 days. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 5/8/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Propose Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 5/1/2020. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo) (jrs)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC Rule 26 Disclosures of Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Conley, Craig)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Conley, Craig)
November 23, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Jacqueline Farwell. (Leffler, Stephen)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Conley, Craig)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Friday, 12/21/2018 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-004574-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2925640), filed by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conley, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farwell v. Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Farwell
Represented By: Stephen R. Leffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Craig C. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?