Smith v. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC

Plaintiff: Donna Smith
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02811
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: John T Fowlkes
1 Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 JUDGMENT signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 1/15/19. (Fowlkes, John)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 1/14/19. (Fowlkes, John) (Main Document 13 replaced on 1/14/2019) (Fowlkes, John).
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Joint Stipulation of Plf's Voluntary Dismissal)(Harvey, Robb)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting DE #10 signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 12/14/18. (Fowlkes, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harvey, Robb)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robb S. Harvey on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications, LLC (Harvey, Robb)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #7 Summons Returned Executed filed by Donna Smith has been filed. For future reference, please note: Filer should include the two page summons when publishing return of service. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jae)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Smith as to Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Kerney, Frank)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Comcast Cable Communications, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2932048), filed by Donna Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kerney, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Smith
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?