Smith v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Linda Smith
Defendant: Lander Nissan of Southaven Mississippi and Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02829
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 Response to Motion, filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Clark, Ryan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the First Amended Complaint by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Clark, Ryan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief can be Granted and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Linda Smith. (agj)
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT Product Liability "AS A Matter of Course" against Lander Nissan of Southaven Mississippi, Nissan North America, Inc., filed by Linda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Declaration)(agj)
January 9, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Assign Johdge Honorable Sheryl H. Lipman on Request of Involuntary filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Clark, Ryan)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Clark, Ryan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Assign Judge Honorable Sheryl H. Lipman on Request of Involuntary Disqualification of Referred United States Magistrate Judge Honorable Charmaine G. Claxton and Attorneys Involved in Non-Consent Overview of Self Represented Litigant (Plaintiff) Non-Stipulation/Non-Consent by all Parties in Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 by Linda Smith. (agj)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Schaffler Quinn on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Quinn, Patrick)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Randolph Bibb, Jr on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Bibb, John)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. for Nissan North America, Inc... (Clark, Ryan)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Nelson Clark on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Clark, Ryan)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Lander Nissan of Southaven Mississippi and returned to filer in order to effect service. (csf)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nissan North America, Inc. and returned to filer in order to effect service. (csf)
December 3, 2018 CLERK'S REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Clerk's review of preliminary matters completed. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 400.00, receipt number M4676040313 (csf)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT Products Liability filed by Linda Smith against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lander Nissan of Southaven Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Schaffler Quinn
Represented By: Ryan Nelson Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?