Battery Alliance Inc. v. Allegiant Power, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Battery Alliance Inc.
Defendant: Noel Sutton, Tom Wilson and Allegiant Power, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02840
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 17 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 3/13/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allegiant Power, LLC, Noel Sutton, Tom Wilson.(Underwood, Richard)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/9/19. (Sullivan, Daniel) [**TEXT ORDER ONLY ~ NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED**]
January 9, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by Allegiant Power, LLC, Noel Sutton, Tom Wilson. (Underwood, Richard)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Underwood on behalf of Tom Wilson (Underwood, Richard)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Underwood on behalf of Allegiant Power, LLC (Underwood, Richard)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Allegiant Power, LLC, Noel Sutton, Tom Wilson. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Tom Wilson summons, #2 Noel Sutton summons)(jae)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Summons by Bruce S. Kramer on behalf of Battery Alliance Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Tom Wilson, #2 Summons Summons to Noel Sutton)(Kramer, Bruce)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Herman Morris on behalf of Battery Alliance Inc. (Morris, Patrick)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Webster Brown on behalf of Battery Alliance Inc. (Brown, Jacob)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Battery Alliance Inc. has been filed. For future reference, please note the civil cover sheet should have a s/signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. 12/7/2018 (jld).
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5218480; 5489116; . (Kramer, Bruce)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400 paid, receipt ATNWDC-2941922. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kramer, Bruce) Receipt info added on 12/6/2018 (cbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battery Alliance Inc. v. Allegiant Power, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel Sutton
Represented By: Richard D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Wilson
Represented By: Richard D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegiant Power, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Battery Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Bruce S. Kramer
Represented By: Jacob Webster Brown
Represented By: Patrick Herman Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?