Andrews v. Ark-Mo Transportation, LLC

Plaintiff: Ralph E. Andrews
Defendant: Ark-Mo Transportation, LLC
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2018cv02845
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Ark-Mo Transportation, LLC of Service of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures (Wyatt, Carl)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Status Conference set for 6/14/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. (wrh)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON MEDIATION. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 01/16/2019. (Fowlkes, John)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/14/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. ADR deadline is 6/3/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2019. Discovery due by 8/9/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 3/11/2019. Motions due by 9/10/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 01/16/2019.
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 1/16/2019. Both parties present in Court with counsel. Parties updated the Court as to the status of the case. The Court accepts the proposed scheduling order & mediation deadline of 06/03/2019, orders to be entered. Case set Friday, 05/02/2019 at 9:00 a.m. for Status Conference. (Plaintiff: Jerrick D. Murrell)(Defense: Carl Wyatt) (Court Reporter Mark Dodson.) (wrh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wyatt, Carl)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (pyb)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ark-Mo Transportation, LLC.(Wyatt, Carl)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ARK-MO TRANSPORTATION, LLC from Circuit Court Shelby County, case number CT-004987-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2943347), filed by ARK-MO TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Complaint)(Wyatt, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Ark-Mo Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ark-Mo Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph E. Andrews
Represented By: Robert L. J. Spence, Jr
Represented By: Jerrick D. Murrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?