Cowley v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Ruvye Cowley
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, United Consumer Financial Services Company, TRANS UNION, LLC. and Royal Furniture Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv02846
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: Tennessee Western District Court
0 Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
1 Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 17 STIPULATION To Extend Time For Trans Union, LLC To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint by TRANS UNION, LLC.. (Shumaker, Heather)
February 6, 2019 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims filed by United Consumer Financial Services Company. (Campbell, L.)
February 6, 2019 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims by United Consumer Financial Services Company. (Campbell, L.)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 14 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER Granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant United Consumer Financial Services Company's response is due 02/06/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 1/7/2019. (pab)
January 4, 2019 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by United Consumer Financial Services Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Campbell, L.)
January 4, 2019 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Consumer Financial Services Company. (Campbell, L.)
January 4, 2019 11 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Webb Campbell, II on behalf of United Consumer Financial Services Company (Campbell, L.)
December 10, 2018 10 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
December 10, 2018 9 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
December 10, 2018 8 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
December 10, 2018 7 Summons Issued as to United Consumer Financial Services Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
December 10, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Royal Furniture Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
December 10, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to TRANS UNION, LLC.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
December 10, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
December 10, 2018 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Ruvye Cowley has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: You electronic s/signature is missing from the civil cover sheet. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. 12/11/2018 (jld).
December 10, 2018 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
December 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Royal Furniture Company, TRANS UNION, LLC., United Consumer Financial Services Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2944230), filed by Ruvye Cowley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Lafferty, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowley v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Consumer Financial Services Company
Represented By: L. Webb Campbell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Furniture Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruvye Cowley
Represented By: Susan Sheperd Lafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?