Muhammad v. Azar, et al
Plaintiff: Lena Muhammad
Defendant: Basem Girgis, Alex M Azar, II and Danielle W. Barnes
Case Number: 2:2018cv02857
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss filed by Danielle W. Barnes, Basem Girgis. (Ridner, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss by Danielle W. Barnes, Basem Girgis. (Ridner, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 2/8/2019. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 1/30/19. (ldc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted filed by Danielle W. Barnes, Basem Girgis. (Ridner, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by Danielle W. Barnes, Basem Girgis. (Ridner, Jeffrey)
January 14, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lena Muhammad as to Alex M Azar, II. (Phillips, Mimi)
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lena Muhammad as to Alex M Azar, II. (Phillips, Mimi)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lena Muhammad as to Alex M Azar, II. (Phillips, Mimi)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lena Muhammad as to Danielle W. Barnes. (Phillips, Mimi)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lena Muhammad as to Basem Girgis. (Phillips, Mimi)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Alex M Azar, II, Danielle W. Barnes, Basem Girgis. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Barnes summons, #2 Girgis summons)(jae)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Lena Muhammad has been filed. For future reference, please note Filer did not add any of the defendants when opening the case. Clerk's office has added the defendants. Civil cover sheet also contains a "wet signature". All documents submitted by attorneys must contain their electronic signature (s/attorney's name). Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Summons by Mimi Phillips on behalf of Lena Muhammad. (Phillips, Mimi)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Summons by Mimi Phillips on behalf of Lena Muhammad. (Phillips, Mimi)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Summons by Mimi Phillips on behalf of Lena Muhammad. (Phillips, Mimi)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by Lena Muhammad against *all defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2948803), filed by Lena Muhammad. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, Mimi) *Modified on 12/18/2018 to correct "against" parties (jae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Azar, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basem Girgis
Represented By: Jeffrey Dale Ridner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle W. Barnes
Represented By: Jeffrey Dale Ridner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Muhammad
Represented By: Mimi Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?