Richards, et al v. Giamanco

Plaintiff: Michael Richards and Jill Richards
Defendant: Donald A Giamanco and Donald A. Giamanco
Respondent: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02019
Filed: January 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set Monday, 03/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STAYING CASE AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Matter to be 'stayed' for one (1) month. This case is therefore 'stayed' until March 18, 2019. The Court will hold a Status conference on Monday, March 18, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 02/15/2019. (Mays, Samuel).
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTES: Status Conference held on 02/14/2019 before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Atty Daniel Alan Seward participated on behalf of the plaintiffs (Michael & Jill Richards); Atty Lori D. Parish representing the defense (Donald A. Giamanco); Respondents Attorney: Russell Curtis Rutledge representing (Nationwide General Insurance Company). Atty Leslie Ballin also participated to provide status on indictment pending in State Court Proceedings. MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support to Stay Proceedings and/or for additional time to respond or otherwise plead to the Complaint #9 brought up by Atty Lori D. Parish & after conferring with counsel, the court concluded that this matter should be stayed for one (1) month. The case is therefore stayed until 03/18/2019. Status Conference will be held on Monday, 03/18/2019 at 9:30 A.M. before Judge Mays. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Nicole Warren) (jam)
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support to Stay Proceedings and/or for additional time to respond or otherwise plead to the Complaint proposed order submitted PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY filed by All Plaintiffs. (Seward, Daniel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Status Conference set Thursday, 02/14/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr added per #10 . Judge Thomas L. Parker no longer assigned to case. (btg)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Transferring Case. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 2/5/19. (jgb)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support to Stay Proceedings and/or for additional time to respond or otherwise plead to the Complaint proposed order submitted by Donald A. Giamanco. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Parish, Lori)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Curtis Rutledge on behalf of Nationwide General Insurance Company (Rutledge, Russell)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Richards as to Donald A Giamanco. (Seward, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Donald A Giamanco. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Nationwide summons)(jae)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
January 6, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
January 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT MICHAEL RICHARDS AND JILL RICHARDS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NATURAL PARENTS OF MICHAEL CONNOR RICHARDS, DECEASED VS. DONALD GIAMANCO against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2958797), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant Giamanco, #3 Summons (Nationwide Underinsured Motorist)(Seward, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards, et al v. Giamanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Richards
Represented By: Daniel Alan Seward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Richards
Represented By: Daniel Alan Seward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald A Giamanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald A. Giamanco
Represented By: Lori D. Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell Curtis Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?