Simpson v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sammie Simpson
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc. and John Doe
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02055
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
1 Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Sammie Simpson Notice of Parties' Inability to Agree on Mediator for Alternative Dispute Resolution (Collins, Jennifer)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 3/13/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 2/24/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 2/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/7/2020. (tlh)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference held on 3/13/2019. Matthew Stombaugh, Juan Williams, Jennifer Collins & James Davis appearing for the Plaintiff. Robert Cox appearing for the Defendant. Deadlines/dates established: Jury Trial set for Monday, 2/24/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial estimated to take 3 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 2/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/7/2020. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo)(1:10-1:28) (tlh)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by United Parcel Service, Inc. Notice of Service- UPS Rule 26 Disclosures (Cox, Robert)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Sammie Simpson Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Collins, Jennifer)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Cox, Robert)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Cox, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Cox, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 3/13/2019 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Parcel Service, Inc. from Shelby Circuit, case number ct-005643-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2971617), filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A. Complaint and Summons)(Cox, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammie Simpson
Represented By: Juan Williams
Represented By: Jennifer Hinds Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?