Thomas v. Tennison Brothers, Inc. et al

Appellee: Tennessee Dept. of Transportation, Tennison Brothers, Inc., Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc. and Lynn Schadt Thomas
Appellant: William H. Thomas, Jr.
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
Case Number: 2:2019cv02066
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
1 Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Tennessee Dept. of Transportation of Intent to Not File a Brief (Willey, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Tennison Brothers, Inc. re #19 Appellee's Brief, #11 Appellant's Brief Notice of Joinder In Brief of Appellee, Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc. (Tennison, Kathy)
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 Appellee's BRIEF by Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.. Appellant Reply Brief due by 3/4/2019. (Spence, Robert)
February 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE Of (X) Appellant (X) Appellee Designation Of Record To The United States District Court For The Western District Of Tennessee (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues, #2 Appellee Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.'s Rule 8009(a)(2) Designation Of Additional Items To Be Included In The Record, #3 Appellee TDOT's Rule 8009(a)(2) Designation Of Additional Items To Be Included In The Record)(csf)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #10 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF #8 ORDER DENYING #4 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/11/2019. (shl)
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tennison Brothers, Inc.. (Tennison, Kathy)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc. re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 2:19-CV-02065 and No. 2:19-CV-02066, #13 Response in Opposition to Motion Notice of Joinder in the Response by Tennessee Department of Transportation in Opposition to Appellant's Motions to Consolidate Appeals (Spence, Robert)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline proposed order submitted filed by Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.. (Spence, Robert)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 2:19-CV-02065 and No. 2:19-CV-02066 filed by Tennessee Dept. of Transportation. (Willey, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate iHeartMedia, Inc. for Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc... (Spence, Robert)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 Appellant's BRIEF by William H. Thomas, Jr. Appellee Brief due by 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thomas, William)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 2:19-CV-02065 and No. 2:19-CV-02066 by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #4 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/5/2019. (shl)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Extend Deadline (proposed order submitted) and Notice of Joinder In Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.'s Response In Opposition filed by Tennison Brothers, Inc.. (Tennison, Kathy)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Extend Deadline (proposed order submitted) proposed order submitted filed by Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.. (Spence, Robert)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Willey on behalf of Tennessee Dept. of Transportation (Willey, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Deadline (proposed order submitted) by William H. Thomas, Jr. (Thomas, William)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING IN BANKRUPTCY APPEAL.. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2019. (csf)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-27850. File received, filed by William H. Thomas, Jr. Appellant Brief due by 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Debtor's Motion for Leave Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 8004 for Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 158(a)(3), #3 Memorandum and Order RE "Debtor's Motion for Leave", #4 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Tennison Brothers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tennessee Dept. of Transportation
Represented By: Michael B. Willey
Represented By: Michael Willey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tennison Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart B. Breakstone
Represented By: Kathy Baker Tennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clear Channel Outdoor, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. J. Spence, Jr
Represented By: Kristina A. Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lynn Schadt Thomas
Represented By: Adam Michael Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: William H. Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Thomas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?