United States of America v. $17,700.00 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $17,700.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Romtin Ziaee
Case Number: 2:2019cv02067
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to $17,700.00 in United States Currency (Drug Enforcement Administration), Romtin Ziaee and Megan Wilson, Esq. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Megan Wilson summons, #2 Romtin Ziaee summons)(jae)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Summons by Christopher E. Cotten on behalf of United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Cotten, Christopher)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 Warrant issued and given to USM. (tlh)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF FORFEITURE ACTION RE #4 ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/5/2019. (shl)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/5/2019. (shl)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (btg)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE against $17,700.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cotten, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $17,700.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Romtin Ziaee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $17,700.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher E. Cotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?