Fleming v. Trans Union, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Walter Fleming, Jr.
Defendant: Covington Pike Acceptance Corporation, RAC Acceptance East, LLC, Memphis Light Gas & Water, TransUnion LLC and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02075
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by RAC Acceptance East, LLC.(VanVactor, Zachary)
March 18, 2019 Filing 18 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference RESET to Friday, 03/29/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (Reset from 03/25/19) (jl)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Monday, 03/25/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC.(Policchio, James)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Fleming, Jr as to RAC Acceptance East, LLC. (Lafferty, Susan)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #9 TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 03/06/2019. Attorney James L. Policchio is admitted to participate in this action as counsel for defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Mays, Samuel)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #12 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 03/06/2019. Defendant shall have up to and including March 20, 2019 to file a responsive pleading. (Mays, Samuel)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by RAC Acceptance East, LLC. (Tipps, Jean)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RAC Acceptance East, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rent-A-Center East, Inc. for RAC Acceptance East, LLC.. (Tipps, Jean)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC.. (Policchio, James)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Proposed Order Submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3006985) by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - State Of Indiana, #2 Certificate Of Good Standing (USDC - Southern District Of Indiana))(Policchio, James)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Correction to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (Lafferty, Susan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(btg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Walter Fleming, Jr. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Civil cover sheet does not include an electronic signature of the attorney; Attorney shall file corrected document as a notice of correction. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (btg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (btg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walter Fleming, Jr (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2976538), filed by Walter Fleming, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons TransUnion, #3 Summons RAC, #4 Summons Covington, #5 Summons MLGW)(Lafferty, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. Trans Union, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Fleming, Jr.
Represented By: Susan Sheperd Lafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Pike Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAC Acceptance East, LLC
Represented By: James L. Policchio, Jr
Represented By: Jean Anne Tipps
Represented By: Zachary M. VanVactor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memphis Light Gas & Water
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: James L. Policchio, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?