Lillard et al v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Nell Lillard and Thomas D. Lillard
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02097
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/19/2019. (jjf)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial is set for Monday, 3/2/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 2/21/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on Friday, 2/14/2020. (jrs)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/19/2019. Kevin A. Snider appeared for the Plaintiff. Brian C. Neal appeared for the Defense. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 3/2/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial is estimated to last 2-3 days. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 2/21/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 2/14/2020. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Sandra Vaughn, Alpha Reporting) (jrs)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is ADVANCED on Tuesday, 3/19/2019 to 10:00 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. This is a time change only. Plaintiff's counsel will attend the telephonic scheduling conference in person. (jrs)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Scheduling Order by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Kroplin, J.)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Kroplin, J.)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET to 3/19/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Insurance Corporation.(Neal, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, 3/12/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Insurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company for Liberty Insurance Corporation.. (Neal, Brian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Insurance Corporation from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-005766-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2986421), filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Neal, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lillard et al v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nell Lillard
Represented By: Kevin A. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D. Lillard
Represented By: Kevin A. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Brian C. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?