Thomas v. United States of America

Petitioner: Jamie Thomas
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02103
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Samuel H Mays
1 Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Text ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 2019-15, this motion is referred to the United States magistrate judge. For good cause shown, the time for the United States to file a response is hereby extended up to and including Wednesday, May 1, 2019. The United States may file a subsequent motion to extend this deadline if appropriate. It is so ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 4/8/2019. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) (Pham, Tu)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order,, (proposed order submitted) by United States of America. (Ritz, Kevin)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #9 FOR ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 04/01/2019. AUSA Kevin G. Ritz is substituted as lead counsel for the United States in this action and AUSA Naya Bedini is withdrawn. (Mays, Samuel)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (proposed order submitted) by United States of America. (Ritz, Kevin)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin G. Ritz on behalf of United States of America (Ritz, Kevin)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #5 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND to movant's motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 03/12/2019. Respondent shall have until April 10, 2019 to file a responsive pleading. (Mays, Samuel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Naya Bedini on behalf of United States of America (Bedini, Naya)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint (proposed order submitted) by United States of America. (Young, Marques)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING UNITED STATES TO RESPOND, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 02/13/2019. The United States file a response to the 2255 Motion within twenty-eight (28) days from the date of entry of this order. Attorneys Tyrone Jemal Paylor and Stephen R. Leffler are released from the attorney-client privilege to the extent necessary to submit an affidavit(s) of counsel and such other documents as may be necessary for the United States to respond adequately to Movant's 2255 Motion. All other matters shall remain privileged. (Mays, Samuel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marques T. Young on behalf of United States of America (Young, Marques)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Jamie Thomas against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jamie Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Represented By: Marques T. Young
Represented By: Naya Bedini
Represented By: Kevin G. Ritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?