Byears v. Ally Financial, Inc.

Plaintiff: Barry Byears
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02110
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 05/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Ostroff, Ethan)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Barry Byears by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Contract)(Ostroff, Ethan)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barry Byears as to Ally Financial, Inc.. (Kerney, Frank)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ally Financial, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Barry Byears has been filed. For future reference, please note "Wet signature on the civil cover sheet".. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ally Financial, Inc., filed by Barry Byears.(Kerney, Frank)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Barry Byears has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 Electronic Signatures 10.1. Failure to provide that electronic signature will render the filing deficient. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ally Financial, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2991631), filed by Barry Byears. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kerney, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byears v. Ally Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Byears
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?