Danzig et al v. Kroger Limited Partnership I

Plaintiff: Bernard Danzig and Miriam Danzig
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02118
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 Amended ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Kroger Limited Partnership I.(Vescovo, Christopher)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Libby, Stephen)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO CHANGE NAME OF PARTY DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 3/26/19. (Norris, Mark)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct by All Plaintiffs. (Libby, Stephen)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 04/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kroger Limited Partnership I.(Vescovo, Christopher)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kroger Limited Partnership I from Shelby County Circuit, case number CT-0367-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2993615), filed by Kroger Limited Partnership I. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents)(Vescovo, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danzig et al v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Danzig
Represented By: Stephen F. Libby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Danzig
Represented By: Stephen F. Libby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Christopher L. Vescovo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?