White v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Penny White
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02122
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penny White. United States of America served on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. U.S. Attorney General served on 3/5/2019. U.S. Attorney served on 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return of Service on VA General Counsel, #2 Summons Return of Service on US Attorney for Western District, #3 Summons Return of Service on VA Southeast District, #4 Summons Return of Service on VA Secretary, #5 Summons Return of Service on VA Memphis)(May, Matthew)
April 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas May on behalf of Penny White (May, Matthew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on United States of America on March 11, 2019, filed by Penny White. (Rosenblum, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Office of Chief Counsel, VA Regional Office, Southeast-North District.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to U.S. Dept of Veterans Affairs, Rober Wilkie, Secretary. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Memphis VA Medical Center. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Main Document 9 replaced on 2/20/2019) (jld).
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, James M. Byne, General Counsel. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States, William P. Barr. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney for the WDTN, D. Michael Dunavant. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2994242), filed by Penny White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney for Western District, #3 Summons US Attorney General, #4 Summons VA General Counsel, #5 Summons VA Memphis, #6 Summons VA Secretary, #7 Summons VA Southeast District, #8 Affidavit Affidavit of Jeffrey S. Rosenblum, #9 Exhibit Certificate of Good Faith)(Rosenblum, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny White
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rosenblum
Represented By: Matthew Thomas May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?