Jones v. Ackerson et al

Plaintiff: Sherry Jones
Defendant: Ulysess Ackerson and XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02124
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Mark S Norris
1 Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. c/o Registered Agent Solutions, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
April 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Summons by Willie Gary on behalf of Sherry Jones. (Gary, Willie)
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Ulysess Ackerson. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Summons by Willie Gary on behalf of Sherry Jones. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Gary, Willie)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Larry A. Strauss.Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 04/05/2019. (Mark S. Norris)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Sherry Jones. (Strauss, Larry)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Willie E. Gary. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 03/29/2019. (Mark Norris)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Larry A. Strauss (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3027494) filed by Sherry Jones has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Attorney Larry Strauss must use his login and password that he receives from pacer to file a Pro Hac Vice motion. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Larry A. Strauss (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3027494) by Sherry Jones. (Gary, Willie)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE re #7 by Sherry Jones of Correction Certificate of Good Standing US District Court (Gary, Willie)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Willie E. Gary (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3021511) filed by Sherry Jones has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: LR 83.4 (A) a certificate of good standing from the highest Court of a state AND FROM A UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Willie E. Gary (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3021511) by Sherry Jones. (Gary, Willie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Sherry Jones has been filed. For future reference, please note civil cover sheet filed as part of the complaint. Please file the civil cover sheet as an attachement. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ulysess Ackerson, XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2995934), filed by Sherry Jones.(Ward, Marcus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Ackerson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Jones
Represented By: Larry A Strauss
Represented By: Willie Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulysess Ackerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?